EP0647256 - POSITIONABLE AND REPOSITIONABLE ADHESIVE ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.1999 [1999/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/15] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Kenneth, D. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
MEIXNER, Larry, A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
BEMIS, Sharon, R. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
CALHOUN, Clyde, D. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
REE, Buren, R. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1995/15] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/15] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93916462.0 | 09.06.1993 | [1995/15] | WO1993US05479 | Priority number, date | US19920904850 | 26.06.1992 Original published format: US 904850 | [1995/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9400525 | Date: | 06.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0647256 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0647256 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02 | [1995/15] | CPC: |
C09J7/38 (EP,US);
B05B12/24 (EP,US);
C09J2301/204 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1405 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24174 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24521 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24851 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2486 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/15] | Title | German: | ANBRINGBARER UND WIEDERANBRINGBARER KLEBEGEGENSTAND | [1997/48] | English: | POSITIONABLE AND REPOSITIONABLE ADHESIVE ARTICLES | [1995/15] | French: | ARTICLES ADHESIFS REPOSITIONNABLES ET REPOSITIONNABLES | [1997/48] |
Former [1995/15] | KLEBENDER ARTIKEL, DER VERSCHOBEN, ABGENOMMEN UND NEU PLAZIERT WERDEN KANN | ||
Former [1995/15] | ARTICLES ADHESIFS REPOSITIONNABLES | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.1995 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/15] | 19.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1594151 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG); | [X]US4023570 (CHINAI KAYS [US], et al); | [A]DE3417746 (JACKSTAEDT GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0149135 ; | [A]EP0257984 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [X]WO9113752 (SANDERS BERNARD [GB]); | [A]US5087494 (CALHOUN CLYDE D [US], et al) |