EP0609413 - IMPROVED HANDLE MECHANISM FOR MANUAL INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.1998 [1998/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSURGE, INC. 150 A Street Needham, MA 02194 / US | [1994/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LICHTMAN, Philip, R. 3 Valley Spring Road Newton, MA 02158 / US | [1994/32] | Representative(s) | Chameroy, Claude, et al Cabinet Malemont 42, avenue du Président Wilson 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Chameroy, Claude, et al c/o Cabinet Malemont 42, avenue du Président Wilson F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93916642.7 | 18.06.1993 | [1994/32] | WO1993US05904 | Priority number, date | US19920934002 | 21.08.1992 Original published format: US 934002 | [1994/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9404084 | Date: | 03.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0609413 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.03.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/42, A61B17/28 | [1995/38] | CPC: |
A61B17/2909 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2922 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2946 (EP,US);
A61B90/03 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/32] | A61B17/42 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/32] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER HANDGRIFFMECHANISMUS FÜR HANDBEDIENTE INSTRUMENTE | [1994/32] | English: | IMPROVED HANDLE MECHANISM FOR MANUAL INSTRUMENTS | [1994/32] | French: | MECANISME DE PREHENSION AMELIORE DESTINE A DES INSTRUMENTS MANUELS | [1994/32] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.1994 | Search fee paid | 18.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 11.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/17] | 26.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2049520 (SAUL SHALER) [A] 1,19,22,23 * page 2, column 1, line 33 - line 54; figures 2,3 *; | [XY]DE1810806 (METZ DR MED GERHARD) [X] 1,2,23 * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3; figures 2,7,8 * [Y] 19,22; | [Y]US4602631 (FUNATSU NOBORU [JP]) [Y] 19,22 * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 4; figures 27-31 *; | [E]US5250056 (HASSON HARRITH M [US]) [E] 1,19,22,23* column 7, line 42 - column 8, line 47; figures 6-9 * | International search | [Y]US1659112 (LITTLEJOHN DANA M); | [A]US3750652 (SHERWIN J); | [X]US4602631 (FUNATSU NOBORU [JP]); | [A]US4889118 (SCHWIEGERLING PAUL E [US]); | [A]US5014407 (BOUGHTEN LARRY R, et al); | [AP]US5201743 (HABER TERRY M [US], et al); | [AE]US5234460 (STOUDER JR ALBERT E [US]) |