EP0708796 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING COMPOSITES BASED ON ORIENTED MESOGENIC THERMOSET RESINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [1997/48] |
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center, Abbott Road Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Robert, E., Jr. 3815 Parkdale #303 San Antonio, Texas 78229 / US | 02 /
EARLS, Jimmy, D. 209 Banyan Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | 03 /
HEFNER, Robert, E., Jr. 109 Wedgewood Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | [1998/22] |
Former [1996/18] | 01 /
JONES, Robert, E., Jr. 100 Lakeview Drive 2014 Clute, TX 77531 / US | ||
02 /
EARLS, Jimmy, D. 209 Banyan Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | |||
03 /
HEFNER, Robert, E., Jr. 109 Wedgewood Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | Representative(s) | Böhm, Brigitte, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Böhm, Brigitte, Dipl.-Chem., Dr., et al Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93917218.5 | 15.07.1993 | [1996/18] | WO1993US06691 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9502631 | Date: | 26.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0708796 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0708796 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/24, C09K19/38 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
C07D303/24 (EP,US);
C08G59/22 (EP,US);
C08J5/243 (EP,US);
C09K2323/05 (EP,US);
C09K2323/055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DUROPLASTISCHEN, MESOGENEN, ORIENTIERTEN KUNSTSTOFFEN ENTHALTENDEN VERBUNDMATERIALIEN | [1996/18] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING COMPOSITES BASED ON ORIENTED MESOGENIC THERMOSET RESINS | [1996/18] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE MATERIAUX COMPOSITES A PARTIR DE RESINES THERMODURCIES, MESOGENES, ORIENTEES | [1996/18] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 14.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0252358 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,5; | [A]EP0409070 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US])[A] 1,5; | [A]US5206321 (HEFNER JR ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1,5 |