EP0746696 - LOCKING FASTENER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATTHEWS, Norman Leslie Level R1, 1 Havelock Street West Perth, W.A. 6005 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states Matthews, Norman Leslie Level R1, 1 Havelock Street West Perth, W.A. 6005 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | MacGregor, Gordon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | MacGregor, Gordon, et al ERIC POTTER CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham, NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93917442.1 | 06.08.1993 | [1996/50] | WO1993AU00404 | Priority number, date | AU1992PL03972 | 06.08.1992 Original published format: AU PL397292 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9403736 | Date: | 17.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0746696 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 17.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16B39/24 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
F16B39/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/50] | Title | German: | VERRIEGELBARE BEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1996/50] | English: | LOCKING FASTENER | [1996/50] | French: | ELEMENT DE FIXATION A VERROUILLAGE | [1996/50] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.1995 | Search fee paid | 17.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 18.05.1995 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 14.02.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.05.1995 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   17.05.1995 | 18.05.1995 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   17.05.1995 | 18.05.1995 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   17.05.1995 | 18.05.1995 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   17.05.1995 | 18.05.1995 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   17.05.1995 | 18.05.1995 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   17.05.1995 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.04.1995 | M01   Fee paid on   17.05.1995 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1026339 ; | [A]US3926237 (ENDERS MAX L); | [A]US4134438 (FRIEBERG BENGT O, et al); | [A]US5080545 (MCKINLAY ALISTAIR N [US]); | [AP]US5203656 (MCKINLAY ALISTAIR N [US]) |