EP0656085 - BRIDGE CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TERON INTERNATIONAL BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES LTD. P.O. Box 1179, 30 Cedar Avenue Hamilton MH1Z / BM | [1995/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERON, William 505 - 111 Echo Drive Ottawa, Ontario K1S 5K8 / CA | [1995/23] | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Taunusstrasse 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr., Gustav-Freytag-Strasse 25 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1995/23] | Weber, Dieter, Dr. Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr., Gustav-Freytag-Strasse 25 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 93917491.8 | 13.08.1993 | [1995/23] | WO1993CA00324 | Priority number, date | US19920929401 | 14.08.1992 Original published format: US 929401 | [1995/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9404756 | Date: | 03.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0656085 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0656085 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E01D21/00, E01D1/00, E04B5/23 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
E04B5/23 (EP,US);
E01D2/00 (EP,US);
E01D21/00 (EP,US);
E01D2101/24 (EP,US);
E01D2101/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/23] | E01D7/02, E01D21/04, E04B5/23 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/23] | Title | German: | BRÜCKENKONSTRUKTION | [1995/23] | English: | BRIDGE CONSTRUCTION | [1995/23] | French: | CONSTRUCTION DE PONTS | [1995/23] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/23] | 06.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.11.1997 | BE | 19.11.1997 | CH | 19.11.1997 | DK | 19.11.1997 | ES | 19.11.1997 | FR | 19.11.1997 | GR | 19.11.1997 | IT | 19.11.1997 | LI | 19.11.1997 | NL | 19.11.1997 | PT | 19.02.1998 | SE | 19.02.1998 | DE | 20.02.1998 | IE | 13.08.1998 | LU | 13.08.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/38] | AT | 19.11.1997 | |
BE | 19.11.1997 | ||
CH | 19.11.1997 | ||
DK | 19.11.1997 | ||
ES | 19.11.1997 | ||
GR | 19.11.1997 | ||
IT | 19.11.1997 | ||
LI | 19.11.1997 | ||
NL | 19.11.1997 | ||
PT | 19.02.1998 | ||
SE | 19.02.1998 | ||
DE | 20.02.1998 | ||
FR | 17.04.1998 | ||
IE | 13.08.1998 | ||
LU | 13.08.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 19.11.1997 | |
BE | 19.11.1997 | ||
CH | 19.11.1997 | ||
DK | 19.11.1997 | ||
ES | 19.11.1997 | ||
GR | 19.11.1997 | ||
IT | 19.11.1997 | ||
LI | 19.11.1997 | ||
NL | 19.11.1997 | ||
PT | 19.02.1998 | ||
SE | 19.02.1998 | ||
DE | 20.02.1998 | ||
FR | 17.04.1998 | ||
IE | 13.08.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 19.11.1997 | |
BE | 19.11.1997 | ||
CH | 19.11.1997 | ||
DK | 19.11.1997 | ||
ES | 19.11.1997 | ||
GR | 19.11.1997 | ||
IT | 19.11.1997 | ||
LI | 19.11.1997 | ||
PT | 19.02.1998 | ||
SE | 19.02.1998 | ||
DE | 20.02.1998 | ||
FR | 17.04.1998 | ||
IE | 13.08.1998 | ||
Former [2001/01] | AT | 19.11.1997 | |
BE | 19.11.1997 | ||
CH | 19.11.1997 | ||
DK | 19.11.1997 | ||
GR | 19.11.1997 | ||
IT | 19.11.1997 | ||
LI | 19.11.1997 | ||
PT | 19.02.1998 | ||
SE | 19.02.1998 | ||
DE | 20.02.1998 | ||
FR | 17.04.1998 | ||
IE | 13.08.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 19.11.1997 | |
BE | 19.11.1997 | ||
CH | 19.11.1997 | ||
DK | 19.11.1997 | ||
GR | 19.11.1997 | ||
IT | 19.11.1997 | ||
LI | 19.11.1997 | ||
PT | 19.02.1998 | ||
SE | 19.02.1998 | ||
DE | 20.02.1998 | ||
FR | 17.04.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 19.11.1997 | |
BE | 19.11.1997 | ||
CH | 19.11.1997 | ||
DK | 19.11.1997 | ||
IT | 19.11.1997 | ||
LI | 19.11.1997 | ||
PT | 19.02.1998 | ||
SE | 19.02.1998 | ||
DE | 20.02.1998 | ||
FR | 17.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/46] | AT | 19.11.1997 | |
BE | 19.11.1997 | ||
CH | 19.11.1997 | ||
DK | 19.11.1997 | ||
LI | 19.11.1997 | ||
PT | 19.02.1998 | ||
SE | 19.02.1998 | ||
DE | 20.02.1998 | ||
FR | 17.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/45] | AT | 19.11.1997 | |
CH | 19.11.1997 | ||
DK | 19.11.1997 | ||
LI | 19.11.1997 | ||
PT | 19.02.1998 | ||
SE | 19.02.1998 | ||
DE | 20.02.1998 | ||
FR | 17.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | AT | 19.11.1997 | |
DK | 19.11.1997 | ||
PT | 19.02.1998 | ||
SE | 19.02.1998 | ||
DE | 20.02.1998 | ||
FR | 17.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/37] | AT | 19.11.1997 | |
DK | 19.11.1997 | ||
PT | 19.02.1998 | ||
SE | 19.02.1998 | ||
DE | 20.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | AT | 19.11.1997 | |
DK | 19.11.1997 | ||
SE | 19.02.1998 | ||
DE | 20.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 19.11.1997 | |
DK | 19.11.1997 | ||
DE | 20.02.1998 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB415844 (FRANCIS ALBERT LEON WELLARD) [Y] 6* figure - *; | [XAY]FR2074643 (SOUSSELIER FRANCOIS) [X] 1-5,25-29,32-34 * the whole document * [A] 9,14 [Y] 6; | [XAY]DE2203126 (POLENSKY & ZOELLNER) [X] 1,4-7,14,15,18,25-29,33,34 * the whole document * [A] 3,9,11,21,22,32 [Y] 10,16,17,19,20,23,30,31,35,36 | [XAY] - TROXELL AND MONTGOMERY, "long span bridge utility,grace at low cost", CIVIL ENGINEERING, NEW YORK US, (197205), vol. 42, no. 5, pages 73 - 76 [X] 33,34,42 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,24,38,43-45 [Y] 10,16,17,19,20,23,30,31,35,36 |