EP0653908 - SPREAD PATH MODIFIER FOR AGRICULTURAL SPREADER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOYLE, David, Stanley 130 Hurndall St. Maungaturoto 1240 / NZ | [1995/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/21] | Representative(s) | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [1995/21] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al c/o Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 93918094.9 | 04.08.1993 | [1995/21] | WO1993NZ00061 | Priority number, date | NZ19920243837 | 04.08.1992 Original published format: NZ 24383792 | [1995/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9403041 | Date: | 17.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0653908 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0653908 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A01C15/00 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
A01C17/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | GB, IE [1995/21] | Title | German: | LEITVORRICHTUNG FÜR SCHLEUDERSTREUER | [1995/21] | English: | SPREAD PATH MODIFIER FOR AGRICULTURAL SPREADER | [1995/21] | French: | SYSTEME DE MODIFICATION DES TRAJECTOIRES D'EPANDAGE POUR EPANDEUR AGRICOLE | [1995/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/21] | 14.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]EP0532055 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [PX] 1,4,5,7,8,11,13 * column 9, line 43 - column 14, line 17; figures 1-22 *; | [A]FR1400911 (AMAZONEN WERKE H DREYER FA) [A] 1,11-13 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2637448 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) [A] 1,4,5,7-9 * page 19, line 6 - page 26; figures 13-18 *; | [A]EP0269501 (NODET GOUGIS [FR]) [A] 1 * column 18, line 35 - column 21, line 12; figures 2,10,19 *; | [A]DE3341703 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) |