EP0660850 - COATED ABRASIVES MADE USING COATABLE UREA-ALDEHYDE COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING A COCATALYST, AND METHODS OF MAKING COATED ABRASIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/27] | COATABLE UREA-ALDEHYDE COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING A COCATALYST, COATED ABRASIVES MADE USING SAME, AND METHODS OF MAKING COATED ABRASIVES | ||
[1996/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORD, Jeffrey, E. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
CHU, Ellen, Y. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
RUDE, Harold, E. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93918656.5 | 05.08.1993 | [1995/27] | WO1993US07357 | Priority number, date | US19920945126 | 15.09.1992 Original published format: US 945126 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9406839 | Date: | 31.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0660850 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0660850 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08G12/12, B24D3/28, B24D3/34 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
C08G12/12 (EP,KR,US);
B24D3/28 (EP,KR,US);
B24D3/344 (EP,US);
C09K3/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/27] | Title | German: | Beschichtete Schleifmittel, hergestellt aus beschichtbaren Harnstoff-Aldehyd-Zusammensetzungen, welche einen Cokatalysator enthalten, und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1996/23] | English: | COATED ABRASIVES MADE USING COATABLE UREA-ALDEHYDE COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING A COCATALYST, AND METHODS OF MAKING COATED ABRASIVES | [1996/23] | French: | ABRASIFS REVETUS PREPARES DE COMPOSITIONS DE REVETEMENTS D'UREE-ALDEHYDE CONTENANT UN COCATALYSEUR ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DES ABRASIFS | [1996/23] |
Former [1995/27] | ÜBERZIEHBARE HARNSTOFFALDEHYDEZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND EIN COKATALYSATOR, DAMIT HERGESTELLTE BESCHICHTETE SCHLEIFMITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [1995/27] | COATABLE UREA-ALDEHYDE COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING A COCATALYST, COATED ABRASIVES MADE USING SAME, AND METHODS OF MAKING COATED ABRASIVES | ||
Former [1995/27] | COMPOSITIONS DE REVETEMENTS D'UREE-ALDEHYDE CONTENANT UN COCATALYSEUR, ABRASIFS REVETUS ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DES ABRASIFS | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.02.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 08.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 18.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.1995 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 15.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.06.1996 | [1997/03] | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2203847 (PIERREFITTE AUBY SA [FR]) [X] 1-7 * claims 1-8 *; | [A]EP0299950 (BLEIBERGER BERGWERKS UNION AG [AT]) [A] * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0398580 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] * examples 17,23 *; | [X]WO9201018 (DYNO INDUSTRIER AS [NO]) [X] 1-7 * claims 1-33 *; | [X]EP0501174 (NAT STARCH CHEM SPA [IT]) [X] 1-7 * page 4, line 1 - line 10; claims 1-10 * |