EP0655079 - FLEXIBLE POLAR THERMOPLASTIC POLYOLEFIN COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/22] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPELTHANN, Heinz, H. 54, route du Creux-de-Boisset CH-1286 Soral / CH | [1995/22] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/22] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93918663.1 | 10.08.1993 | [1995/22] | WO1993US07369 | Priority number, date | GB19920017381 | 14.08.1992 Original published format: GB 9217381 | [1995/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9404610 | Date: | 03.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0655079 | Date: | 31.05.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0655079 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/02 | [1995/22] | CPC: |
C08L23/02 (EP);
C08L73/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/02, C08L2666/22 (EP);
C08L73/00, C08L2666/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/22] | Title | German: | WEICHE, POLARE, THERMOPLASTISCHE POLYOLEFINZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1995/22] | English: | FLEXIBLE POLAR THERMOPLASTIC POLYOLEFIN COMPOSITIONS | [1995/22] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYOLEFINES THERMOPLASTIQUES POLAIRES ET SOUPLES | [1995/22] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/22] | 03.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3633056 (KABELMETAL ELECTRO) [A] 1 * Abstract *; | [A]WO8803543 (E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |