EP0714518 - METHOD OF IMPROVING FAT SATURATION DURING MRI [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIANCE PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION 3040 Science Park Road San Diego California 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states ALLIANCE PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION 3040 Science Park Road San Diego California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EILENBERG, Steven, S. 202 West Cliff Solana Beach, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
KIRKLAND, W., Dean. 1841 Old Field Court El Cajon, CA 92019 / US | 03 /
WALTERS, Mark, A. 12596 Cabezon Place San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 04 /
DeFRANCO, Jack 12828 Corbett Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [1996/23] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/23] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93918674.8 | 05.08.1993 | [1996/23] | WO1993US07396 | Priority number, date | US19920928953 | 11.08.1992 Original published format: US 928953 | [1996/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9404946 | Date: | 03.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0714518 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0714518 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.03.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/483, G01R33/565 | [1996/23] | CPC: |
G01R33/3678 (EP,US);
G01R33/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER FETTSÄTTIGUNG WÄHREND DER BILDERZEUGUNG MITTELS MAGNETISCHER RESONANZ | [1999/22] | English: | METHOD OF IMPROVING FAT SATURATION DURING MRI | [1996/23] | French: | PROCEDE D'AMELIORATION DE LA SATURATION DES GRAISSES LORS D'UN EXAMEN PAR IRM | [1996/23] |
Former [1996/23] | VERFAHREN ZUR FETTSATTIGUNGSVERBESSERUNG WÄHREND DER BILDERZEUGUNGMITTELS MAGNETISCHER RESONANZ | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.1995 | Search fee paid | 13.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.03.1995 | Examination requested [1996/23] | 05.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0488200 (ARAKAWA CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1-5,12-14 * page 2, line 1 - page 2, line 42 * * page 6, line 15 - page 6, line 40 * * page 7, line 7 - page 7, line 19 * * page 10, line 25 - page 10, line 42; figures 1,2 *; | [XP]US5227727 (SEGAWA TORU [JP], et al) [XP] 1-3,5,12-14,19,20,23,24 * column 2, line 3 - column 2, line 56 * * column 5, line 10 - column 12, line 47; figures 2-8,11-13 *; | [A] - ROBERT F. MATTREY ET AL., "Perfluorochemicals as Gastrointestinal Contrast Agents for MR Imaging: Preliminary Studies in Rats and Humans", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF ROENTGENOLOGY, vol. 148, pages 1259 - 1263, XP000565391 [A] 15-17 *the whole document* | International search | [Y]US4967764 (BASSER PETER J [US]); | [Y]US4993415 (LONG DAVID M [US]); | [YP]US5183045 (TAKAMURA SUSUMU [JP], et al) |