EP0607417 - ARRANGEMENT FOR PREVENTING CONTACT CORROSION IN MAGNESIUM WHEELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.1997 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STAHLSCHMIDT & MAIWORM GmbH Bruchstrasse 34 D-67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | [1994/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAIWORM, Friedhelm Schulstr. 34 D-58791 Werdohl / DE | 02 /
PFORR, Hans-Joachim Jahnstr. 18 D-58809 Neuenrade / DE | [1994/30] | Representative(s) | Preissner, Nicolaus, et al Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/08] | Preissner, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Michelis & Preissner, Haimhauser Strasse 1 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/30] | Michelis, Theodor, Dipl.-Ing., et al Tattenbachstrasse 9 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93918895.9 | 18.08.1993 | [1994/30] | WO1993DE00752 | Priority number, date | DE19924227259 | 18.08.1992 Original published format: DE 4227259 | [1994/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9404379 | Date: | 03.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0607417 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0607417 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60B3/14 | [1994/30] | CPC: |
B60B1/08 (EP,US);
B60B3/008 (EP,US);
B60B3/145 (EP,US);
B60B3/16 (EP,US);
C23F15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/30] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR VERMEIDUNG VON KONTAKTKORROSIONEN BEI MAGNESIUMRÄDERN | [1994/30] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR PREVENTING CONTACT CORROSION IN MAGNESIUM WHEELS | [1994/30] | French: | AGENCEMENT PREVENANT LA CORROSION PAR CONTACT DANS DES ROUES EN MAGNESIUM | [1994/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/30] | 07.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.11.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]JPH04368202 ; | [A]JPS5836701 ; | [A]DE2207771 (THURNER BAYER DRUCKGUSS)[A] 1 | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930518), vol. 017, no. 248, Database accession no. (M - 1411), & JP04368202 A 19921221 (HONDA) [PX] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830520), vol. 007, no. 116, Database accession no. (M - 216), & JP58036701 A 19830303 (TOYOTA) [A] 1 * abstract * |