EP0658189 - WASHING AND CLEANING AGENTS WITH BUILDER SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOTTWITZ, Beatrix Urdenbacher Allee 51 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
UPADEK, Horst Im Sandforst 26 D-40883 Ratingen / DE | 03 /
KRINGS, Peter Wedelstra e 72 D-47807 Krefeld / DE | [1995/25] | Application number, filing date | 93919191.2 | 26.08.1993 | [1995/25] | WO1993EP02310 | Priority number, date | DE19924229660 | 04.09.1992 Original published format: DE 4229660 | [1995/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9405764 | Date: | 17.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0658189 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0658189 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/37, C11D3/00, C11D3/12, C11D11/00 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
C11D17/065 (EP);
C11D11/00 (EP);
C11D17/06 (EP);
C11D3/10 (EP);
C11D3/1273 (EP);
C11D3/128 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/25] | Title | German: | WASCH- UND REINIGUNGSMITTEL MIT BUILDERSUBSTANZEN | [1995/25] | English: | WASHING AND CLEANING AGENTS WITH BUILDER SUBSTANCES | [1995/25] | French: | PRODUITS DE LAVAGE ET DE NETTOYAGE CONTENANT DES ADJUVANTS | [1995/25] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/25] | 26.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.06.1997
04.07.1997
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB Opponent's representative Waldren, Robin Michael Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | 02
17.06.1997
01.07.1997
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.06.1997
04.07.1997
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB Opponent's representative Waldren, Robin Michael Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
02
17.06.1997
01.07.1997
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | |||
Former [2008/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.06.1997
04.07.1997
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB Opponent's representative Waldren, Robin Michael Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
02
17.06.1997
01.07.1997
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | |||
Former [2002/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.06.1997
04.07.1997
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars GB-London EC4P 4BQ / GB Opponent's representative Waldren, Robin Michael Lloyd Wise, Treager & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
02
17.06.1997
01.07.1997
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | |||
Former [2002/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.06.1997
04.07.1997
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars GB-London EC4P 4BQ / GB Opponent's representative Waldren, Robin Michael Lloyd Wise, Treager & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
02
17.06.1997
01.07.1997
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Peet, Jillian Wendy Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | |||
Former [1997/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.06.1997
04.07.1997
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars GB-London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
02
17.06.1997
01.07.1997
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Peet, Jillian Wendy Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | |||
Former [1997/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.06.1997
04.07.1997
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars GB-London EC4P 4BQ / GB | 19.08.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.12.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.12.1997 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.1998 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 06.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 08.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 08.08.2002 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2002/45] | Appeal following opposition | 05.03.1999 | Appeal received No. T0242/99 | 01.06.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.08.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 08.08.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.08.2002 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 18.09.1996 | GB | 18.09.1996 | IT | 18.09.1996 | NL | 18.09.1996 | ES | 19.12.1996 | BE | 31.08.1997 | AT | 26.08.2001 | CH | 31.08.2001 | LI | 31.08.2001 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/38] | GB | 18.09.1996 | |
IT | 18.09.1996 | ||
NL | 18.09.1996 | ||
ES | 19.12.1996 | ||
FR | 14.02.1997 | ||
BE | 31.08.1997 | ||
AT | 26.08.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | GB | 18.09.1996 | |
IT | 18.09.1996 | ||
NL | 18.09.1996 | ||
FR | 14.02.1997 | ||
BE | 31.08.1997 | ||
AT | 26.08.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/08] | GB | 18.09.1996 | |
IT | 18.09.1996 | ||
NL | 18.09.1996 | ||
FR | 14.02.1997 | ||
BE | 31.08.1997 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 18.09.1996 | |
IT | 18.09.1996 | ||
FR | 14.02.1997 | ||
BE | 31.08.1997 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 18.09.1996 | |
IT | 18.09.1996 | ||
FR | 14.02.1997 | ||
BE | 31.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/41] | GB | 18.09.1996 | |
FR | 14.02.1997 | ||
BE | 31.08.1997 | ||
Former [1997/34] | BE | 18.09.1996 | |
GB | 18.09.1996 | ||
FR | 14.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/30] | BE | 18.09.1996 | |
GB | 18.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/25] | BE | 18.09.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0221777 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,2,4-7,9* page 2, line 43 - page 6, line 50 *; | [A]EP0368137 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1,4,6,8 * page 2, line 27 - page 4, line 53; example 1 *; | [A]WO9102047 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1,2,4-8,10,11 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 23, paragraph 3; examples 1-5 *; | [A]EP0421664 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1,3,4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9109927 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 15, paragraph 3 *; | [A]WO9207928 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1,2,4-6,8-10 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 11, paragraph 2 * |