EP0610489 - REUSABLE TRANSPORT CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAUSER-WERKE GmbH Schildgesstrasse 71 - 163 D-50321 Brühl / DE | [1994/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURGDORF, Märten Fasanenweg 20 D-53913 Swisttal / DE | [1994/33] | Application number, filing date | 93919280.3 | 06.09.1993 | [1994/33] | WO1993EP02407 | Priority number, date | DE19924230027 | 10.09.1992 Original published format: DE 4230027 | DE19920014567U | 28.10.1992 Original published format: DE 9214567 U | [1994/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9405554 | Date: | 17.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0610489 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0610489 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65D6/12, B65D6/22, B65D19/12 | [1994/33] | CPC: |
B65D61/00 (EP);
B65D11/1833 (EP);
B65D25/38 (EP);
Y02W30/80 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/33] | Title | German: | MEHRWEG-TRANSPORTBEHÄLTER | [1994/33] | English: | REUSABLE TRANSPORT CONTAINER | [1994/33] | French: | RECIPIENT DE TRANSPORT REUTILISABLE | [1994/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.1994 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/33] | 20.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/30] | Request for further processing for: | 09.08.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 09.08.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.08.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.11.1995 | 30.09.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.03.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 30.07.1997 | GR | 30.07.1997 | NL | 30.07.1997 | BE | 30.09.1997 | SE | 30.10.1997 | [2003/08] |
Former [2000/05] | DK | 30.07.1997 | |
GR | 30.07.1997 | ||
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
SE | 30.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/46] | DK | 30.07.1997 | |
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
SE | 30.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 30.07.1997 | |
SE | 30.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | SE | 30.10.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]US954676 (HORTON SAMUEL C [US], et al); | [A]CH63722 (BLAZEJ VIKTOR F [AT]); | [A]DE2442322 (OHRTMANN HANS OTTO); | [A]FR2413274 (GAUTHIER GERARD [FR]); | [A]GB2245883 (GOYMER MAURICE FREDERICK) | [X] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRA- TED, P,Q Sektion, Woche 8420, 27 Juni 1984 DERWENT PUBLICATIONS, LTD., London | Examination | - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRA- TED, P,Q Sektion, Woche 8420, 27 Juni 1984 DERWENT PUBLICATIONS, LTD., London, SU-A-1036-625 (POPOR) |