EP0655955 - PROCESS FOR ENCAPSULATING A WASTE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP INTER-CORPORATE LICENSING LIMITED 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/23] | For all designated states BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP INTER-CORPORATE LICENSING LIMITED 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAZA, Stanley George 272 Knowsley Road Bootle Merrseyside L20 5DQ / GB | [1995/23] | Representative(s) | Neville, Peter Warwick Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 10 Fleet Place London EC4M 7SB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/23] | Neville, Peter Warwick Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 93919453.6 | 18.08.1993 | [1995/23] | WO1993GB01757 | Priority number, date | GB19920017594 | 19.08.1992 Original published format: GB 9217594 | [1995/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9404290 | Date: | 03.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0655955 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0655955 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B09B3/00, C02F11/00, C04B18/02, C04B18/06, C04B28/04, G21F9/16 | [1995/23] | CPC: |
B09C1/08 (EP,US);
B09B3/00 (KR);
B09B3/25 (EP,US);
C02F11/00 (KR);
C02F11/008 (EP,US);
C04B18/021 (EP,US);
G21F9/16 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00784 (EP,US);
Y02W30/91 (EP,US);
Y10S588/90 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B18/021, C04B18/0418, C04B40/0263 (EP,US);
C04B18/021, C04B18/08, C04B40/0263 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/48] |
Former [1995/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR EINKAPSELUNG VON ABFALLMATERIAL | [1995/23] | English: | PROCESS FOR ENCAPSULATING A WASTE MATERIAL | [1995/23] | French: | PROCEDE D'ENCAPSULATION DE MATIERES RESIDUAIRES | [1995/23] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/23] | 25.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.11.1998 | CH | 04.11.1998 | ES | 04.11.1998 | FR | 04.11.1998 | GR | 04.11.1998 | IT | 04.11.1998 | LI | 04.11.1998 | NL | 04.11.1998 | SE | 04.11.1998 | DK | 04.02.1999 | PT | 10.02.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 04.11.1998 | |
CH | 04.11.1998 | ||
ES | 04.11.1998 | ||
FR | 04.11.1998 | ||
GR | 04.11.1998 | ||
LI | 04.11.1998 | ||
NL | 04.11.1998 | ||
SE | 04.11.1998 | ||
DK | 04.02.1999 | ||
PT | 10.02.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 04.11.1998 | |
CH | 04.11.1998 | ||
ES | 04.11.1998 | ||
GR | 04.11.1998 | ||
LI | 04.11.1998 | ||
NL | 04.11.1998 | ||
SE | 04.11.1998 | ||
DK | 04.02.1999 | ||
PT | 10.02.1999 | ||
FR | 02.04.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 04.11.1998 | |
CH | 04.11.1998 | ||
ES | 04.11.1998 | ||
GR | 04.11.1998 | ||
LI | 04.11.1998 | ||
NL | 04.11.1998 | ||
SE | 04.11.1998 | ||
PT | 10.02.1999 | ||
FR | 02.04.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 04.11.1998 | |
CH | 04.11.1998 | ||
ES | 04.11.1998 | ||
GR | 04.11.1998 | ||
LI | 04.11.1998 | ||
SE | 04.11.1998 | ||
PT | 10.02.1999 | ||
FR | 02.04.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 04.11.1998 | |
CH | 04.11.1998 | ||
GR | 04.11.1998 | ||
LI | 04.11.1998 | ||
SE | 04.11.1998 | ||
PT | 10.02.1999 | ||
FR | 02.04.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 04.11.1998 | |
CH | 04.11.1998 | ||
GR | 04.11.1998 | ||
LI | 04.11.1998 | ||
PT | 10.02.1999 | ||
FR | 02.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 04.11.1998 | |
CH | 04.11.1998 | ||
LI | 04.11.1998 | ||
PT | 10.02.1999 | ||
FR | 02.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 04.11.1998 | |
CH | 09.02.1999 | ||
LI | 09.02.1999 | ||
PT | 10.02.1999 | ||
FR | 02.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/22] | AT | 04.11.1998 | |
PT | 10.02.1999 | ||
FR | 02.04.1999 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 04.11.1998 | |
PT | 10.02.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | PT | 10.02.1999 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6367595 ; | [A]JPH03106854 ; | [A]SU1293144 ; | [A]JPS6061086 ; | [A]SU1421722 ; | [A]JPS62233799 ; | [A]DE3006483 (BRAUN ANGOTT MASCH & ANLAGEN [DE], et al) [A] 17,18 * claim - *; | [A]GB2096390 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]FR2518525 (NIPPON FURNACE KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 17,18 * figure 7 *; | [X]FR2591513 (DORYOKURO KAKUNENRYO [JP]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 1 - line 18; example -; claim - *; | [A]US4828761 (MATTUS ALFRED J [US], et al) [A] 1,5,9 * example .; claim - *; | [A]US4931192 (COVINGTON J STANSILL [US], et al) [A] 1,10,11 * claim - *; | [A]EP0408545 (TECHFORM ENG AG [CH]) [A] 1-5 * page 5, line 1 - line 19; claim - * * page 6, line 2 - line 10 *; | [A]EP0417705 (ONODA CEMENT CO LTD [JP], et al)[A] 1; | [PX]GB2254322 (MADDOX DEREK [GB], et al) [PX] 1 * the whole document * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 18, Database accession no. 88-123203, & JPS6367595 A 19880326 (MITSUBISHI METAL) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 24, Database accession no. 91-175132, & JPH03106854 A 19910507 (DAIICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 45, Database accession no. 87-319484, & SU1293144 A 19870228 (UKR-CELLULOSE-PAPER) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850808), vol. 9, no. 192, Database accession no. (C - 296), & JP60061086 A 19850408 (KIKUSUI KAGAKU) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 10, Database accession no. 89-075961, & SU1421722 A 19880907 (URALS NONFER METAL) [A] 1,7,9,10,14 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 47, Database accession no. 87-329881, & JPS62233799 A 19871014 (TOSHIBA ET AL.) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * | Examination | EP0303339 |