EP0655167 - HYDROGEN POWER CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.05.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 09.07.1997 [1997/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H POWER CORPORATION 60 Montgomery Street Belleville, NJ 07109 / US | For all designated states KAUFMAN, Arthur Burnett Terrace West Orange, NJ 07052 / US | [1995/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAUFMAN, Arthur Burnett Terrace West Orange, NJ 07052 / US | [1995/22] | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/22] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 93920030.9 | 13.08.1993 | [1995/22] | WO1993US07623 | Priority number, date | US19920929629 | 13.08.1992 Original published format: US 929629 | [1995/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9405049 | Date: | 03.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0655167 | Date: | 31.05.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.03.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/14, C25F5/00, C25D9/04, C25D9/06, C25D11/04, C25D11/08, H01M8/02, H01M8/10 | [1995/44] | CPC: |
H01M8/04291 (EP,US);
H01M8/0213 (EP,US);
H01M8/1007 (EP,US);
H01M8/241 (EP);
H01M8/2457 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0082 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1995/22] | H01M2/14, C25F5/00, C25D9/04, C25D9/06, C25D11/04, C25D11/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/22] | Title | German: | WASSERSTOFFKRAFTZELLE | [1995/22] | English: | HYDROGEN POWER CELL | [1995/22] | French: | PILE ELECTRIQUE A L'HYDROGENE | [1995/22] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.1995 | Search fee paid | 09.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/22] | 05.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/28] | 22.02.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/28] | 01.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4826741 (ADLHART OTTO J [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 2; example 1 * * column 5, line 60 - line 66 *; | [A]US4769297 (REISER CARL A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 37 - line 59; figure 2 *; | [A]JPS63110555 ; | [A]US4855193 (MCELROY JAMES F [US]); | [A]FR2398392 (ENGELHARD MIN & CHEM [US]); | [A]EP0120139 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [A] 8,9 * page 9, line 3 - line 21 *; | [A]FR2103864 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD) [A] 8-10 * page 3, paragraph 1; claim 9; table 2 *; | [A]FR1460001 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO) [A] 8,9 * page 1, column L, paragraph L *; | [A]US4219611 (BREAULT RICHARD D [US]) [A] 12 * column 1, line 23 - line 44 * | [A] - PETER J. SCHÜTZ, "PREVENTION OF MEMBRANE DEHYDRATION IN PEM FUEL CELLS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYMPOSIUM ON FUEL CELLS NOVEMBER 6-7 1989, vol. 89, no. 4, pages 87 - 93, XP000856052 [A] 1 * page 88, paragraph L - page 89, paragraph 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880922), vol. 012, no. 355, Database accession no. (E - 661), & JP63110555 A 19880516 (HITACHI LTD) [A] * abstract * | International search | [AYX]US4737421 (UEMURA TAKEO [JP], et al); | [Y]US4401533 (SAITO KAZUHISA [JP], et al); | [Y]US3671411 (RAY JAMES D, et al) |