EP0662077 - CD27 LIGAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immunex Corporation One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states IMMUNEX CORPORATION One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | ||
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states IMMUNEX CORPORATION 51 University Street Seattle Washington 98101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKMANN, M, Patricia 5454 Ragan Lane Poulsbo, Washington 98370 / US | 02 /
GOODWIN, Raymond, G. 3322 - 8th Avenue West Seattle, WA 98119 / US | 03 /
GIRI, Judith, G. 8020 Corliss Avenue North Seattle, WA 98103 / US | 04 /
ARMITAGE, Richard, J. 5133 Eagle Harbor Drive Bainbridge Island, WA 98110 / US | [1995/36] |
Former [1995/28] | 01 /
BECKMANN, M., Patricia 15875 Nesika Bay Road Poulsbo, WA 98370 / US | ||
02 /
GOODWIN, Raymond, G. 3322 - 8th Avenue West Seattle, WA 98119 / US | |||
03 /
GIRI, Judith, G. 8020 Corliss Avenue North Seattle, WA 98103 / US | |||
04 /
ARMITAGE, Richard, J. 5133 Eagle Harbor Drive Bainbridge Island, WA 98110 / US | Representative(s) | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [1995/28] | Chapman, Paul William, et al Kilburn & Strode, 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 93920446.7 | 01.09.1993 | [1995/28] | WO1993US08223 | Priority number, date | US19920941648 | 08.09.1992 Original published format: US 941648 | US19930106507 | 13.08.1993 Original published format: US 106507 | [1995/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9405691 | Date: | 17.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0662077 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0662077 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.03.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/04, C07K14/52, C07K16/00, C12P21/06, C12N15/00 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
C07K16/2875 (EP,US);
C07K14/70575 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
Y10S930/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/01] | C07H21/04, C07K14/52, C07K15/28, C12P21/06, C12N15/00 | ||
Former IPC [1996/02] | C07H21/04, C07K14/00, C07K15/28, C12P21/06, C12N15/00 | ||
Former IPC [1995/28] | C07H21/04, C07K13/00, C07K15/28, C12P21/06, C12N15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/28] | Title | German: | CD27 LIGAND | [1995/28] | English: | CD27 LIGAND | [1995/28] | French: | LIGAND CD27 | [1995/28] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.1995 | Search fee paid | 10.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/28] | 02.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 11.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2003 | Observations by third parties | 16.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2007 | BE | 14.02.2007 | DK | 14.02.2007 | NL | 14.02.2007 | SE | 14.05.2007 | GR | 15.05.2007 | PT | 16.07.2007 | LU | 01.09.2007 | IE | 03.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | [2010/05] |
Former [2008/45] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
IE | 03.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/05] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9410308 (IMMUNEX CORP [US]) [E] 9* Seq. id. n. 7. Summary of the invention*; | [DY] - D. CAMERINI ET AL.,, "The T cell activation antigen CD27 is a member of the nerve growth factor/tumor necrosis factor receptor gene family", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 147, no. 9, pages 3165 - 3169, XP002016796 [DY] 1-7 * the whole document * | [DY] - R.J. ARMITAGE ET AL.,, "Molecular and biological characterization of a murine ligand for CD40", NATURE, LONDON, GB, (1992), vol. 357, pages 80 - 82, XP002016797 [DY] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/357080a0 | [PX] - R.G. GOODWIN ET AL.,, "Molecular and biological characterization of a ligand for CD27 defines a new family of cytokines with homology to tumor necrosis factor", CELL, (1993), vol. 73, pages 447 - 456, XP002016675 [PX] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(93)90133-B | [T] - M.R. BOWMAN ET AL.,, "The cloning of CD70 and its identification as the ligand for CD27", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 152, pages 1756 - 1761, XP002016676 [T] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4816567 (CABILLY SHMUEL [US], et al) | [Y] - Nature, Volume 350, issued 04 April 1991, M.L. RIORDAN and J.C. MARTIN, "Oligonucleotide-Based Therapeutics", pages 442-443, entire document. | [XY] - Eur. J. Immunol., Volume 18(5), issued May 1988, R.A.W. VAN LIER et al., "Anti-CD27 Monoclonal Antibodies Identify Two Functionally Distinct Subpopulations within the CD4+ T Cell Subset", pages 811-816, entire document. | [Y] - EMBO Journal, Volume 8, Number 1, issued 1989, D.P. GEARING et al., "Expression Cloning of a Receptor for Human Granulocyte-Macrophage Colony-Stimulating Factor", pages 3667-3676, entire document. | [Y] - Science, Volume 241, issued 29 July 1988, J.E. SIMS et al., "cDNA Expression Cloning of the IL-1 Receptor, a Member of the Immunoglobulin Superfamily", pages 585-589, entire document. | [Y] - Science, Volume 241, issued 12 August 1988, K. YAMASAKI et al., "Cloning and Expression of the Human Interleukin-6 (BSF-2/IFNbeta2) Receptor", pages 825-828, entire document. | [Y] - J. Immunol., Volume 147(9), issued 01 November 1991, D. CAMERINI et al., "The T Cell Activation Antigen CD27 is a Member of the Nerve Growth Factor/Tumor Necrosis Factor Receptor Gene Family", pages 3165-3169, entire document. | Examination | US5573924 | - Declaration by coinventor Raymond G Goodwin filed for corresponding U.S. application, now U.S. patent No 5,573,924: *dUnexpected difficulties in cloning CD27L*d | - Stein H. et al., 1989, *dCluster Report CD70*d, in Knapp W et al., ed., Leucocyte Typing IV, p.446, Oxford University Press | - HINTZEN RQ ET AL, "CD70 represents the human ligand for CD27", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 6, no. 3, pages 477 - 480, XP002956787 | - Office action response dated 22.12.1994 for corresponding US case (US 5,573,924) | - PALOCZI K ET AL., "The Pattern of Activation Antigen Expression on T-Lymphocyte Subpopulation in Infectious Mononucleosis", HAEMATOLOGIA, vol. 24, no. 2, pages 83 - 90, XP009017756 | - PALOCZI K ET AL., "Detection of Activation Antigens on chronic Lymphocytic Leukaemia Cells", LEUKEMIA AND LYMPHOMA, vol. 3, no. 1, pages 31 - 36, XP009017755 | - PILERI S ET AL., "Lymphohistiocytic T-cell Lymphoma (Anaplastic Large Cell Lymphoma CD30+ /Ki-1+ with a High Content of Reactive Histiocytes)", HISTOPATHOLOGY, vol. 16, pages 383 - 391 | other | US5573924 | - STEIN H. ET AL, "A5 Cluster Report: CDw70", STEIN H. ET AL, KNAPP W. ET AL, LEUCOCYTE TYPING IV, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1989), pages 446 - 455, XP002956786 | - HINTZEN R.Q. ET AL, "CD70 represents the human ligand for CD27", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 477 - 480, XP002956787 |