EP0632848 - PROCESS FOR PRETREATING THE SURFACES OF PLASTIC COMPONENTS AND PLASTIC COMPONENT PRETREATED BY THIS PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/02] | PROCESS FOR PRETREATING THE SURFACES OF PLASTIC COMPONENTS | ||
[1997/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.1998 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1997/51] |
Former [1995/02] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THURM, Siegfried Am Damm 5 a D-4005 Meerbusch 3 / DE | 02 /
SOMMER, Klaus Unterscheiderweg 43 a D-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 2 / DE | 03 /
BIER, Peter Bethelstrasse 18 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 04 /
ELSCHNER, Andreas Lederstrasse 6 D-4330 Mülheim/Ruhr / DE | 05 /
KOWITZ, Manfred Herrmann-Vennemann-Strasse 7 D-4130 Moers / DE | 06 /
SANDQUIST, Axel Hasenstrasse 6 D-4019 Monheim / DE | [1995/02] | Application number, filing date | 93920515.9 | 17.03.1993 | [1995/02] | WO1993EP00630 | Priority number, date | DE19924209807 | 26.03.1992 Original published format: DE 4209807 | DE19934306971 | 05.03.1993 Original published format: DE 4306971 | [1995/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9319218 | Date: | 30.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0632848 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0632848 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/02, C23C16/02, C23C14/20, C23C16/06 | [1995/02] | CPC: |
C23C14/30 (EP,US);
C23C14/022 (EP,US);
C23C14/20 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31678 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31681 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VORBEHANDLUNG DER OBERFLÄCHEN VON KUNSTSTOFFTEILEN SOWIE EIN NACH DIESEM VERFAHREN VORBEHANDELTES KUNSTSTOFFTEIL | [1997/51] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRETREATING THE SURFACES OF PLASTIC COMPONENTS AND PLASTIC COMPONENT PRETREATED BY THIS PROCESS | [1997/51] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRETRAITEMENT DE LA SURFACE DE PIECES EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE ET PIECE EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE PRETRAITEE PAR CE PROCEDE | [1997/51] |
Former [1995/02] | VERFAHREN ZUR VORBEHANDLUNG DER OBERFLÄCHEN VON KUNSTSTOFFTEILEN | ||
Former [1995/02] | PROCESS FOR PRETREATING THE SURFACES OF PLASTIC COMPONENTS | ||
Former [1995/02] | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT INITIAL DE LA SURFACE DE PIECES EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.09.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 06.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2648827 (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR]); | [A]EP0057374 (UOP INC [US]) | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Week 3186, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 86 200991 Ç31! |