EP0632944 - PROCESS FOR TRANSMITTING OR STORING DIGITALIZED, MULTI-CHANNEL AUDIO SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut für Rundfunktechnik GmbH Floriansmühlstrasse 60 80939 München / DE | [2000/23] |
Former [1995/02] | For all designated states Institut für Rundfunktechnik GmbH Floriansmühlstrasse 60 D-80939 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILZLE, Andreas Am Krautgarten 2a D-81243 München / DE | 02 /
STOLL, Gerhard Ahornweg 21 D-85406 Zolling / DE | 03 /
THEILE, Günther Hauptstrasse 26A D-82544 Thanning / DE | 04 /
LINK, Martin Unter der Linde 7 D-80939 München / DE | [1995/02] | Representative(s) | Konle, Tilmar, et al Patentanwalt Benderstrasse 23a 81247 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/02] | Konle, Tilmar, et al Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Tilmar Konle Benderstrasse 23a D-81247 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93920518.3 | 17.03.1993 | [1995/02] | WO1993EP00629 | Priority number, date | DE19924209544 | 24.03.1992 Original published format: DE 4209544 | [1995/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9319542 | Date: | 30.09.1993 | [1993/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0632944 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0632944 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04H5/00, H04S3/00, H04S3/02, H04B1/66 | [1995/02] | CPC: |
H04H20/88 (EP,US);
H04B1/665 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN ODER SPEICHERN DIGITALISIERTER, MEHRKANALIGER TONSIGNALE | [1995/02] | English: | PROCESS FOR TRANSMITTING OR STORING DIGITALIZED, MULTI-CHANNEL AUDIO SIGNALS | [1995/02] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION OU DE MEMORISATION DE SIGNAUX AUDIO NUMERISES A PLUSIEURS CANAUX | [1995/02] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.1994 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.08.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 05.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.1995 | 31.03.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.05.1996 | 31.03.1997 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   06.06.1997 | 31.03.1999 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   14.06.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0402973 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) | [A] - ICASSP 92 - IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS,SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING Bd. 2, 23. März 1992, SAN FRANCISCO, US Seiten 569 - 572 J.D JOHNSTON ET AL. 'SUM-DIFFERENCE STEREO TRANSFORM CODING' | [A] - ICASSP 91 - IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING Bd. 5, 14. Mai 1991, TORONTO, CA Seiten 3601 - 3604 R.G. VAN DER WAAL ET AL. 'Subband Coding of Stereophonic Digital Audio Signals' | [A] - ICASSP 89 - IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING Bd. 3, 23. Mai 1989, GLASGOW, GB J.D. JOHNSTON 'Perceptual Transform Coding of Wideband Stereo Signals' in der Anmeldung erwähnt |