EP0663000 - ADDITIVES FOR ORGANIC LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC. 1900 East Linden Avenue Linden New Jersey 07036-0710 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/29] | For all designated states EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC. 1900 East Linden Avenue Linden, New Jersey 07036-0710 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAPROTTI, Rinaldo White Witch House East Hanney Oxfordshire OX12 0HQ / GB | 02 /
SMITH, Anthony, Kitson 18 Western Avenue Woodley Reading Berkshire RG5 3BH / GB | [1995/29] | Representative(s) | Mansell, Keith Rodney, et al Infineum UK Ltd. Law Department P.O. Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/29] | Mansell, Keith Rodney, et al Exxon Chemical Limited European Patents and Licences Exxon Chemical Technology Centre P O Box 1 GB-Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 93920793.2 | 21.09.1993 | [1995/29] | WO1993EP02560 | Priority number, date | GB19920019962 | 22.09.1992 Original published format: GB 9219962 | [1995/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9406894 | Date: | 31.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0663000 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0663000 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/22, B01D19/04, C10L1/14 | [1995/29] | CPC: |
C10L10/02 (EP);
C10L1/22 (KR);
B01D19/04 (KR);
B01D19/0413 (EP);
C10L1/143 (EP);
C10L1/224 (EP);
C10L10/14 (EP);
C10L1/1616 (EP);
C10L1/1641 (EP);
C10L1/165 (EP);
C10L1/1658 (EP);
C10L1/1666 (EP);
C10L1/1683 (EP);
C10L1/1691 (EP);
C10L1/1824 (EP);
C10L1/1852 (EP);
C10L1/188 (EP);
C10L1/1881 (EP);
C10L1/1883 (EP);
C10L1/189 (EP);
C10L1/1895 (EP);
C10L1/1905 (EP);
C10L1/1955 (EP);
C10L1/1963 (EP);
C10L1/1966 (EP);
C10L1/1973 (EP);
C10L1/1985 (EP);
C10L1/221 (EP);
C10L1/2222 (EP);
C10L1/2225 (EP);
C10L1/232 (EP);
C10L1/2364 (EP);
C10L1/2366 (EP);
C10L1/2368 (EP);
C10L1/238 (EP);
C10L1/2383 (EP);
C10L1/2387 (EP);
C10L1/2412 (EP);
C10L1/2437 (EP);
C10L1/2443 (EP);
C10L1/245 (EP);
C10L1/305 (EP);
C10L1/306 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B01D19/0413, B01D19/0422, B01D19/0436 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/29] | Title | German: | ZUSÄTZE FÜR ORGANISCHE FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [1995/29] | English: | ADDITIVES FOR ORGANIC LIQUIDS | [1995/29] | French: | ADDITIFS POUR LIQUIDES ORGANIQUES | [1995/29] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/37: Teilanmeldung 96201711.7 eingereicht am 21/06/96 | EPB 1996/37: Divisional application 96201711.7 filed on 21/06/96 | EPB 1996/37: Demande divisionnaire 96201711.7 déposée le 21/06/96 | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/29] | 27.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96201711.7 / EP0736590 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.01.1997 | NL | 08.01.1997 | SE | 08.04.1997 | [2003/08] |
Former [1998/11] | AT | 08.01.1997 | |
SE | 08.04.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 08.01.1997 | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB658494 (SHELL REFINING & MARKETING CO, et al) [X] 1,3-14,16,17,19-25 * page 5, line 32 - line 54 * [Y] 26,27; | [X]US2805135 (ALAN BELL, et al) [X] 21,22,24,25 * claims 4,8 *; | [X]US3127354 (DE GROOTE ET AL.) [X] 21-25 * column W *; | [A]FR1416295 (ARMOUR & CO) [A] 23 * example 9 *; | [DX]US3259586 (DICKSON WOODROW J, et al) [DX] 1-25 * column W *; | [A]US3313736 (DICKSON WOODROW J, et al) [A] 1-27* column W *; | [XY]FR1584938 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 14-20 * the whole document * [Y] 1-13; | [XY]FR2253082 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 14-20 * page 3 - page 4 * * page 7 - page 8 * [Y] 26,27; | [XAY]EP0055355 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 14-20 * page 6 * * page 4, line 21 - line 26 * [A] 10 [Y] 26,27; | [X]US5084197 (GALIC MARY [US], et al) [X] 26 * column 9, line 34 - line 45 * * column 24, line 31 - line 42 *; | [PY]US5192336 (GREWAL RUPINDER S [US]) [PY] 1-13 * column W * |