EP0617581 - INNERBOOT FOR SPORTS SHOES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDICA S.p.A Via Montebelluna 5/7 31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states NORDICA S.p.A Via Montebelluna 5/7 I-31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIGNAGO, Pietro Via Daniel, 6 I-31044 Montebelluna / IT | [1994/40] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 93920829.4 | 27.09.1993 | [1994/40] | WO1993EP02621 | Priority number, date | IT1992TV00109 | 05.10.1992 Original published format: IT TV920109 | [1994/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9407386 | Date: | 14.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0617581 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/04, A43B19/00 | [1994/40] | CPC: |
A43B5/0405 (EP);
A43B19/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1994/40] | Title | German: | INNENSCHUH FÜR SPORTSCHUHE | [1994/40] | English: | INNERBOOT FOR SPORTS SHOES | [1994/40] | French: | CHAUSSON INTERNE POUR CHAUSSURES DE SPORT | [1994/40] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/47] | 08.03.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CH578325 (KASTINGER HERMANN) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]CH626793 (RAICHLE SPORTSCHUH AG [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4534122 (MACPHAIL DAVID M [CA]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE8605432U (A. MAYER) [A] 1 * the whole document * |