EP0669050 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A MULTI-PHASE MACHINE WITH NON-SALIENT POLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILL, Wolfgang Ortenbergstrasse 3 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | For all designated states HILL, Wolfgang Ortenbergstrasse 3 D-76135 Karlsruhe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/35] | Application number, filing date | 93920848.4 | 30.09.1993 | [1995/35] | WO1993EP02677 | Priority number, date | DE19924234108 | 09.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4234108 | [1995/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9409546 | Date: | 28.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0669050 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0669050 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/06, H02K1/16, H02K3/00 | [1995/35] | CPC: |
H02K1/278 (EP,US);
H02K1/06 (EP);
H02K1/16 (EP);
H02K1/17 (EP);
H02K15/024 (EP);
H02K15/03 (EP);
H02K3/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [1995/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MEHRPHASIGEN VOLLPOLMASCHINE | [1995/35] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A MULTI-PHASE MACHINE WITH NON-SALIENT POLES | [1995/35] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE MACHINE A POLES LISSES POLYPHASEE | [1995/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.05.1995 | Examination requested [1996/10] | 15.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.10.1995 | M01   Fee paid on   19.10.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPS61128750 ; | [A]CH391071 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [A] 2* page 1, line 51 - page 2, line 9; figure 1 *; | [XY]GB1098125 (ARTUR SCHEIB) [X] 1 * page 3, line 132 - line 41; figures 1-3; claim 2 * [Y] 3,4; | [A]DE2033235 (ROTEL AG) [A] 1,2 * page 3, line 8 - page 5, line 5; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US3827141 (HALLERBACK S) [Y] 4 * column 5, line 3 - line 37; figures 2,7 * * column 7, line 16 - line 28 *; | [XY]WO9115892 (UNIQUE MOBILITY INC [US]) [X] 1,3 * page 14, line 31 - page 15, line 21; figures 4,5,6,22 * * page 32, line 28 - page 34, line 27 * * page 39, line 4 - line 25 * [Y] 4 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861030), vol. 10, no. 319, Database accession no. (E - 450)<2375>, & JP61128750 A 19860616 (NISSAN) [X] 1,5 * abstract * [Y] 3,4 |