EP0720805 - SOFT HANDOFF IN A CELLULAR TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [1997/40] | For all designated states NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [1996/28] | For all designated states NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY Mäkkylän Puistotie 1 FIN-02600 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUSZYNSKI, Peter Sänkikuja 6 FIN-00390 Helsinki / FI | [1996/28] | Representative(s) | Äkräs, Tapio Juhani, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | Äkräs, Tapio Juhani, et al Oy Kolster Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 93920866.6 | 24.09.1993 | [1996/28] | WO1993FI00385 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9508899 | Date: | 30.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0720805 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0720805 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
H04W36/12 (EP,US);
H04W36/18 (EP,US);
H04W56/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/28] | Title | German: | SANFTES WEITERREICHEN IN EINEM ZELLULAREN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [1996/28] | English: | SOFT HANDOFF IN A CELLULAR TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [1996/28] | French: | TRANSFERT PROGRESSIF DANS UN SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CELLULAIRE | [1996/28] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 02.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/28] | 08.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.11.2001 | BE | 14.11.2001 | CH | 14.11.2001 | GR | 14.11.2001 | IT | 14.11.2001 | LI | 14.11.2001 | NL | 14.11.2001 | DK | 14.02.2002 | PT | 14.02.2002 | SE | 14.02.2002 | ES | 30.05.2002 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 14.11.2001 | |
BE | 14.11.2001 | ||
CH | 14.11.2001 | ||
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
LI | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
DK | 14.02.2002 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 14.11.2001 | |
BE | 14.11.2001 | ||
CH | 14.11.2001 | ||
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
LI | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
DK | 14.02.2002 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 14.11.2001 | |
BE | 14.11.2001 | ||
CH | 14.11.2001 | ||
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
LI | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 14.11.2001 | |
CH | 14.11.2001 | ||
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
LI | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 14.11.2001 | |
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
LI | 14.11.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 14.11.2001 | |
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | PT | 14.02.2002 | |
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 14.02.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4696052 (BREEDEN ROBERT L [US]); | [A]WO9222966 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [X]WO9306663 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) |