EP0663927 - USE OF COATING COMPOSITIONS FOR COATING ALKYD-CONTAINING COATINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/30] | COATING COMPOSITION | ||
[2007/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | 14.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [2009/38] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | ||
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states Avecia B.V. Sluisweg 12, P.O. Box 123 5140 AC Waalwijk / NL | ||
Former [1995/30] | For all designated states ZENECA RESINS BV Sluisweg 12, P.O. Box 123 NL-5140 AC Waalwijk / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEAR, Peter 90 Aberdeen Avenue Cambridge, Massachusetts 01238 / US | 02 /
GOOS, Hendricus, Cornelius Cypressenstraat 17 NL-4849 AN Dorst / NL | 03 /
OVERBEEK, Gerardus, Cornelius Groningenstraat 9 NL-5144 EJ Waalwijk / NL | 04 /
STEVENS, Emile, Johannes, Maria Hoefstraat 292 NL-5014 NS Tilburg / NL | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Schmitt, Maja, et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Schmitt, Maja, et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [2006/24] | Schmitt, Maja, et al DSM intellectual Property DSM IP Assets BV Geleen Office PO Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [2005/39] | van Tol-Koutstaal, Charlotte A. DSM Intellectual Property Office Geleen P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [2000/10] | Sheller, Alan, et al Intellectual Property Group Avecia Limited P.O. Box 42 Hexagon House Blackley Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | ||
Former [1995/30] | Sheller, Alan, et al Intellectual Property Group Zeneca Specialties P.O. Box 42 Hexagon House Blackley Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | Application number, filing date | 93920961.5 | 17.09.1993 | [1995/30] | WO1993GB01964 | Priority number, date | GB19920021222 | 09.10.1992 Original published format: GB 9221222 | [1995/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9409045 | Date: | 28.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0663927 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0663927 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C09D133/14 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
B05D7/54 (EP,US);
C09D133/14 (EP,US);
C08F220/283 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/30] | C08F220/34, C09D133/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/30] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG ALKYDHALTIGER BESCHICHTUNGEN | [2007/49] | English: | USE OF COATING COMPOSITIONS FOR COATING ALKYD-CONTAINING COATINS | [2007/49] | French: | Utilisation de compositions de revetment POUR ENDUIRE des revêtements d'alkydes | [2007/46] |
Former [1995/30] | BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | ||
Former [1995/30] | COATING COMPOSITION | ||
Former [1995/30] | COMPOSITION DE REVETEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/30] | 20.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0247171 ; | JPH0459849 [ ] (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 13, Database accession no. 90-095409, & JPH0247171 A 19900216 (NIPPON OILS & FATS K.K.) [X] 1-9,12,16,17 * abstract * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19901210), vol. 113, no. 24, Database accession no. 213934w [ ] * abstract * | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920907), vol. 117, no. 10, Database accession no. 92354d [X] 17 * abstract * |