EP0662032 - THERMOPLASTIC COATED SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H.B. FULLER COMPANY 2400 Energy Park Drive St. Paul Minnesota 55108 / US | For all designated states ROVER GROUP LIMITED International Headquarters, Warwick Technology Park Warwick Warwickshire CV34 6RG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | For all designated states H.B. FULLER COMPANY 2400 Energy Park Drive St. Paul Minnesota 55108 / US | ||
For all designated states ROVER GROUP LIMITED International Headquarters, Warwick Technology Park Warwick CV34 6RG / GB | |||
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states H.B. FULLER COMPANY 2400 Energy Park Drive St. Paul Minnesota 55108 / US | ||
For all designated states ROVER GROUP LIMITED International House Bickenhill Lane Bickenhill Birmingham B37 7HQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DODD, Keith Herbert 5 Parsons Drive Richmond Park Gnosall Staffordshire ST20 0QS / GB | 02 /
EASTERLOW, Ronald Arthur 312 Broad Lane Coventry CV5 7AT / GB | 03 /
SMITH, Gordon Frederick 31 Myton Crescent Warwick CV34 6QA / GB | 04 /
STEPHENSON, Peter John 21 Ettington Close Wellesbourne Warwick CV35 9RJ / GB | 05 /
WELTON, Nicolas Jason 112 Greenfield Road Harborne Birmingham B17 0EH / GB | [1995/28] | Representative(s) | Carter, Caroline Ann, et al ABEL & IMRAY 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | Carter, Caroline Ann, et al ABEL & IMRAY Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93920994.6 | 23.09.1993 | [1995/28] | WO1993GB01997 | Priority number, date | GB19920020207 | 24.09.1992 Original published format: GB 9220207 | GB19930005708 | 19.03.1993 Original published format: GB 9305708 | GB19930005709 | 19.03.1993 Original published format: GB 9305709 | [1995/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9406612 | Date: | 31.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0662032 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B29C37/00, B29C41/08, B29C41/22, B29C45/16, B29C47/06, B29C49/04, // B29K23/00, B29K77/00, B29K96/00, B29K105/06, B29L9/00, B29L31/30 | [1995/28] | CPC: |
B29C45/1679 (EP,US);
B29C37/0028 (EP);
B29C37/0032 (EP);
B29C45/14778 (EP);
B29C45/1642 (EP);
B29C48/0017 (EP,US);
B29C49/04 (EP,US);
B29C49/22 (EP,US);
B29C49/24 (EP,US);
B29C2037/0035 (EP);
B29C2037/0039 (EP);
B29C2049/2404 (EP);
B29C2949/3074 (EP);
B29C41/08 (EP);
B29C45/00 (EP);
B29C45/0013 (EP);
B29C48/00 (EP,US);
B29C48/03 (EP,US);
B29C48/06 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/19 (EP,US);
B29C48/21 (EP,US);
B29C48/32 (EP,US);
B29C48/335 (EP,US);
B29C49/00 (EP);
B29C49/251 (EP);
B29C73/02 (EP);
B29K2023/12 (EP);
B29K2027/06 (EP);
B29K2055/02 (EP);
B29K2069/00 (EP);
B29K2075/00 (EP);
B29K2077/00 (EP);
B29K2079/08 (EP);
B29K2096/005 (EP);
B29K2101/10 (EP);
B29K2105/0005 (EP);
B29K2105/002 (EP);
B29K2105/0032 (EP);
B29K2105/0044 (EP);
B29K2105/0088 (EP);
B29K2105/16 (EP);
B29K2105/26 (EP);
B29K2705/00 (EP);
B29K2995/0005 (EP);
B29K2995/002 (EP);
B29K2995/0021 (EP);
B29K2995/003 (EP);
B29L2009/00 (EP);
B29L2031/30 (EP);
B29L2031/3005 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/28] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETE SUBSTRATE AUS THERMOPLASTISCHEN WERKSTOFFE | [1995/28] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC COATED SUBSTRATES | [1995/28] | French: | SUBSTRATS THERMOPLASTIQUES PORTANT UN REVETEMENT | [1995/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/28] | 22.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/30] | Request for further processing for: | 02.06.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 02.06.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.07.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH01235635 ; | [Y]JPS6013516 ; | [A]GB1171085 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 60,61* page 1, line 81 - line 89; claims 1-6 *; | [A]GB2097803 (SCHULMAN A INC) [A] 60,61 * page 3, line 11 - line 13; claims 1,4,7-9 *; | [Y]US4440908 (MCCLAIN DOROTHEE M [US]) [Y] 6,12-19 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 24 * * column 16, line 62 - column 17, line 4; claims 1-3,6,7 *; | [A]EP0180383 (ARON KASEI KK [JP]) [A] 35-38,42 * page 5, line 5 - page 7, line 10 *; | [Y]DE3539088 (DAINIPPON TORYO KK [JP], et al) [Y] 35-38,42 * claims 1,8 *; | [Y]EP0364897 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 40 * page 7, line 10 - line 21; claims 1-10 *; | [X]FR2664531 (BRUN PIERRE) [X] 60,61 * figure 1; claims 1-5 * | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 89-319128, & JPH01235635 A 19890920 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 1,2,4,7-10,20-34,39,41,43-54,56-59,62-66 * abstract * [Y] 6,11-19,35-38,40,42,55 | [XAY] - "BI-INJECTION: UNE TECHNIQUE OUBLIÉE", PLASTIQUES MODERNES ET ELASTOMERES, PARIS FR, (199112), vol. 43, no. 10, pages 64 - 66 [X] 3 * the whole document * [A] 20-28 [Y] 11,55 | [XAY] - W. FILLMANN, "Die wirtschaftliche Herstellung von Produkten nach dem Mehrkomponenten-Spritzgiessverfahren beim Einsatz von Regranulat, Kunststoffabfällen und gefüllten Kunststoffen", PLASTVERARBEITER, SPEYER/RHEIN DE, (197802), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 66 - 71 [X] 3 * page 66, column L, paragraph 2 - page 67, column L, line 3; figures 1-3,5,6 * [A] 20-28 [Y] 11,55 | [XY] - J. THEBERGE, "IM Alternatives Produce Performance Advantages", PLASTICS ENGINEERING, GREENWICH, CONN US, (199102), vol. 47, no. 2, pages 27 - 31 [X] 3 * page 28, column M, paragraph L - page 29, column M, line 1; figures 3-6 * [Y] 11,55 | [PXY] - C. JAROSCHEK, "Neue Wege beim Sandwich-Spritzgiessen", KUNSTSTOFFE, MUNCHEN DE, (199307), vol. 83, no. 7, pages 519 - 521 [PX] 3 * figures 1,3,5 * [PY] 11,55 | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "Molding of Conductive Material on Skin Parts Requiring Electro-Magnetic Shielding", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, EMSWORTH GB, (199109), vol. 329, no. 69, page 685 [Y] 35-38,42 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 85-058320, & JPS6013516 A 19850124 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [Y] 35-38,42 * abstract * |