EP0664761 - INFUSION PACKETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.1997 [1997/29] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/30] | For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1995/32] | For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1995/31] | For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER ZON, Petrus, Wilhelmus, Maria 110 Laan van Nederhoven NL-3334 BP Zwijndrecht / NL | [1995/31] | Representative(s) | Butler, David John, et al Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | Butler, David John, et al Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1996/04] | Roscoe, Brian Corrie, et al UNILEVER PLC Patents Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1995/31] | Gura, Henry Alan, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 93921044.9 | 01.10.1993 | [1995/31] | WO1993GB02049 | Priority number, date | EP19920309014 | 02.10.1992 Original published format: EP 92309014 | [1995/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9407763 | Date: | 14.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0664761 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0664761 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/00 | [1995/31] | CPC: |
B65D85/808 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/31] | Title | German: | AUFGUSSBEUTEL | [1995/31] | English: | INFUSION PACKETS | [1995/31] | French: | SACHETS D'INFUSION | [1995/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.1995 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/31] | 27.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 24.10.1996 | [1997/22] | Cited in | International search | [DA]US2466281 (SHAW WILLIAM R) [DA] 1* column W *; | [A]US3597222 (KALEMBA THADDEUS JOHN) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]WO9113580 (SHOMARLA PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1 * abstract * |