EP0614925 - THERMOPLASTIC POLYURETHANE DERIVED FROM POLYTETRAMETHYLENE CARBONATE DIOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.1998 [1998/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8205 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | ||
Former [1994/37] | For all designated states ASAHI KASEI KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOYAMA, Masaoki 31-13, Sakuragaoka 1-chome Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 239 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Tomonari 16-14, Sakuramori 2-chome Yamato-shi Kanagawa 242 / JP | 03 /
KAWAI, Kenzou 2-11, Nakazato 4-chome Minami-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 232 / JP | 04 /
MORI, Motoyoshi 16-7, Minamikase 3-chome Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [1994/37] | Representative(s) | Blake, John Henry Francis Brookes Batchellor 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | Blake, John Henry Francis BROOKES AND MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93921089.4 | 29.09.1993 | [1994/37] | WO1993JP01394 | Priority number, date | JP19920258748 | 29.09.1992 Original published format: JP 25874892 | [1994/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9407934 | Date: | 14.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0614925 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.04.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/44, C09D175/06, D06N3/14, C08G64/02, C08G64/30 | [1994/37] | CPC: |
D06N3/14 (EP);
C08G18/10 (EP);
C08G18/44 (EP);
C09D175/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/37] | Title | German: | VON POLYTETRAMETHYLENCARBONATDIOL ABGELEITETES THERMOPLASTISCHES POLYURETHAN | [1994/37] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC POLYURETHANE DERIVED FROM POLYTETRAMETHYLENE CARBONATE DIOL | [1994/37] | French: | POLYURETHANE THERMOPLASTIQUE DERIVE DE POLYTETRAMETHYLENE CARBONATE DIOL | [1994/37] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.1994 | Translation filed | 18.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.1994 | Search fee paid | 18.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 02.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/16] | 18.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [PX]JPH0539340 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [X]JPS61266426 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [X]JPH03244624 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [X]JPH01113041 (WADA SEIMITSU SHIKEN, et al); | [PX]JPH0543864 (NITTA GELATIN KK); | [XY]JPS58118815 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO); | [Y]JPH03244619 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [Y]JPS60130616 (KURARAY CO); | [Y]JPS60104118 (KURARAY CO); | [XY]US4463141 (ROBINSON IVAN M [US]); | [Y]JPS6375030 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) | by applicant | JPS5663079 | JPS59100778 | JPS59100779 | JPS5556124 | JPS6312896 | JPS6329687 | JPH03111419 | JPS5330760 | JPS57117523 | US4440937 | US3426042 | US3663569 | JPS62501080 | - POLYMER, (1992), vol. 33, no. 7, pages 1384 - 1390 | - POLYMER (KOREA, (1990), vol. 14, no. 5, pages 487 - 496 | - Polyurethane Gijutsu (Polyurethane technology, NIKKAN KOGYO SHIMBUN, LTD., (1976), pages 23 - 3 | DE19893930995 |