|
15.07.2009 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.06.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
05.03.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2009 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2006 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.10.2005 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2004 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
64 |
|
04.03.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
58 |
|
04.03.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
04.03.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
42 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Statement of grounds |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.02.2004 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2004 |
Statement of grounds |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
25.02.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
10.12.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.10.2003 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2003 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2003 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2003 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2003 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2003 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
20.07.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.07.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.04.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.04.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.02.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.05.1995 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.1995 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.02.1995 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.02.1995 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
28.04.1994 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.04.1994 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
108 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.02.1994 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.02.1994 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
104 |
|
03.02.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
70 |
|
03.02.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
72 |