EP0663938 - COLOPHONIUM SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.1998 [1998/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMCKE, Thomas Haus-Endt-Strasse 64 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
URBATH, Hartmut Emil-Kikuth-Strasse 9 D-42389 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
TAMM, Horst Agnes van Brakelstrasse 40 D-41748 Viersen / DE | 04 /
WINDHÖVEL, Udo Haydnstrasse 24 D-40789 Monheim / DE | 05 /
WENZEL, Udo Ellenbeek 19 D-42489 Wülfrath / DE | 06 /
ZSCHÄBITZ, Kirsten Brockenstrasse 28 D-40597 Düsseldorf / DE | [1995/30] | Application number, filing date | 93921865.7 | 28.09.1993 | [1995/30] | WO1993EP02635 | Priority number, date | DE19924233734 | 07.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4233734 | [1995/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9407957 | Date: | 14.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0663938 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0663938 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08L93/04, C09J157/00, // (C09J157/00, 193:04) | [1995/30] | CPC: |
C08L93/04 (EP);
C09J157/00 (EP);
C08L2666/26 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09J157/00, C08L2666/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, LU, NL, PT [1995/30] | Title | German: | KOLOPHONIUMLÖSUNG | [1995/30] | English: | COLOPHONIUM SOLUTION | [1995/30] | French: | SOLUTION DE COLOPHANE | [1995/30] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/30] | 21.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4654388 (LOFGREN PER-ERIK [SE]) [A] 1,7,8,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 5 *; | [A]JPS63230776 ; | [A]EP0276691 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * column 2, line 45 - line 55 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 7 *; | [A]JPS61293278 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 44, Database accession no. 88-312303, & JPS63230776 A 19880927 (TOYO INK MFG) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 06, Database accession no. 87-038959, & JPS61293278 A 19861224 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM) [A] 8 * abstract * |