EP0667821 - DEVICE FOR COOLING DRIVE COMPONENTS AND HEATING A PASSENGER COMPARTMENT OF AN ELECTRIC VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. Mauserstrasse 3 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARUSCHKE, Wilhelm Rechbergweg 5 D-73117 Wangen / DE | 02 /
LOCHMAHR, Karl Mohnweg 5 D-71665 Vaihingen / DE | 03 /
ROJNICA, Werner Jakobstrasse 21 D-73734 Esslingen / DE | [1995/34] | Representative(s) | Riedel, Peter, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwalts-Kanzlei Dipl.-Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner Menzelstrasse 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | Riedel, Peter, et al c/o Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner Menzelstrasse 40 D-70192 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93921915.0 | 05.10.1993 | [1995/34] | WO1993EP02712 | Priority number, date | DE19924238364 | 13.11.1992 Original published format: DE 4238364 | [1995/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9411212 | Date: | 26.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0667821 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667821 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [1995/34] | CPC: |
B60H1/034 (EP,US);
B60H1/00278 (EP,US);
B60H1/00392 (EP,US);
B60L58/26 (EP,US);
B60H2001/00307 (EP,US);
B60L2240/34 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/34] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUM KÜHLEN VON ANTRIEBSKOMPONENTEN UND ZUM HEIZEN EINES FAHRGASTRAUMES EINES ELEKTROFAHRZEUGS | [1995/34] | English: | DEVICE FOR COOLING DRIVE COMPONENTS AND HEATING A PASSENGER COMPARTMENT OF AN ELECTRIC VEHICLE | [1995/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE REFROIDIR DES COMPOSANTS D'ENTRAINEMENT ET DE CHAUFFER L'HABITACLE D'UN VEHICULE ELECTRIQUE | [1995/34] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/34] | 26.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.12.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9216389 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-4,6,7 * page 19, line 5 - page 20, line 20; figures 5A-5B; claim 1 *; | [AP]DE4115141 (EBERSPAECHER J [DE]) [AP] 1,8,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US4456055 (YOSHIMI AKIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPS638015 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880610), vol. 12, no. 201, Database accession no. (M - 707)<3048> , & JP63008015 A 19880113 (NIPPON DENSO) [A] 1,11 * abstract * | Examination | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12no. 201 (M-707)(3048) 10. Juni 1988 & JP,A, | - 63 008 015 (NIPPON DENSO) 13. Januar 1988 |