EP0725878 - ANTI-THEFT DEVICE FOR SHOES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.11.1998 [1998/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M W TRADING APS Durupsvej 33 DK-7870 Glyngöre / DK | [1996/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLMGREN, Bertil Räng Sandsvägen 5 S-235 91 Vellinge / SE | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Ström, Tore, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | Ström, Tore, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB Studentgatan 1 P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 93922118.0 | 29.09.1993 | [1996/33] | WO1993SE00787 | Priority number, date | SE19920002833 | 29.09.1992 Original published format: SE 9202833 | [1996/33] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9408115 | Date: | 14.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0725878 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0725878 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E05B73/00, E05B69/00 | [1996/33] | CPC: |
E05B73/0017 (EP,US);
E05B69/003 (EP,US);
Y10T24/44504 (EP,US);
Y10T70/411 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5004 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5009 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/33] | Title | German: | DIEBSTAHLSICHERUNG FÜR SCHUHE | [1996/33] | English: | ANTI-THEFT DEVICE FOR SHOES | [1996/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF ANTIVOL POUR CHAUSSURES | [1996/33] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.1994 | Translation filed | 02.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.05.1995 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 27.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 12.11.1997 | PT | 12.02.1998 | [1998/37] |
Former [1998/30] | DK | 12.11.1997 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9007046 (PIHLMAN TAUNO ILMARI [FI]) |