EP0663860 - PLATE BENDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nya Nossebro Mekaniska Verkstad AB Box 32 465 21 Nossebro / SE | [1999/30] |
Former [1995/30] | For all designated states BJÖRK, Reidar Björkhedsgatan 10 S-465 31 Nossebro / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAGNMARK, Lars-Olof Pilgatan 7 S-441 33 Alingsas / SE | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Lindberg, Klas Valter Bo, et al AWAPATENT AB, Södra Hamngatan 37-41, P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | Lindberg, Klas Valter Bo, et al AWAPATENT AB, Södra Hamngatan 37-41, P.O. Box 11394 S-404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 93922129.7 | 05.10.1993 | [1995/30] | WO1993SE00805 | Priority number, date | SE19920002912 | 05.10.1992 Original published format: SE 9202912 | [1995/30] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9407622 | Date: | 14.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0663860 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0663860 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B21D5/14 | [1995/30] | CPC: |
B21D5/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/30] | Title | German: | PLATTE BIEGEMASCHINE | [1995/30] | English: | PLATE BENDING MACHINE | [1995/30] | French: | MACHINE A CINTRER LES TOLES | [1995/30] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.1995 | Translation filed | 07.04.1995 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 07.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/30] | 14.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.01.1999 | BE | 13.01.1999 | FR | 13.01.1999 | NL | 13.01.1999 | DK | 13.04.1999 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 13.01.1999 | |
BE | 13.01.1999 | ||
NL | 13.01.1999 | ||
DK | 13.04.1999 | ||
FR | 11.06.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 13.01.1999 | |
BE | 13.01.1999 | ||
NL | 13.01.1999 | ||
FR | 11.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | AT | 13.01.1999 | |
BE | 13.01.1999 | ||
FR | 11.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/22] | AT | 13.01.1999 | |
FR | 11.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/21] | AT | 13.01.1999 | |
Former [2000/12] | DE | 14.04.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE638323 (WILHELM HEINEN); | [A]US3103965 (SAVORY FREDERICK R); | [X]US4056962 (GERHARDT FRED) |