EP0660741 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR PLAYING BINGO OVER A WIDE GEOGRAPHIC AREA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | 11.07.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIORETTI, Philip, R. 81 West Walk West Haven, CT 06516 / US | [1995/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2000/43] | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Patent and Trade Mark Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1995/27] | Robson, Aidan John, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 93922154.5 | 07.09.1993 | [1995/27] | WO1993US08374 | Priority number, date | US19920946176 | 16.09.1992 Original published format: US 946176 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9406526 | Date: | 31.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0660741 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0660741 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.03.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A63F3/06 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
A63F3/081 (EP,US);
A63F7/06 (KR);
A63F3/0645 (EP,US);
G07F17/32 (EP,US);
A63F2003/082 (EP,US);
A63F2009/0004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM SPIELEN VON BINGO ÜBER EINEN GRÖSSEREN ABSTAND | [1995/27] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR PLAYING BINGO OVER A WIDE GEOGRAPHIC AREA | [1995/27] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE JOUER AU BINGO DANS UNE VASTE ZONE GEOGRAPHIQUE | [1995/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.1995 | Search fee paid | 22.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 02.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 23.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 28.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 26.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98107316.6 / EP0867209 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.02.2000
22.02.2000
ADMISSIBLE THE NATIONAL BINGO GAME ASSOCIATION LIMITED Lexham House, 75 High Street North, Dunstable Bedfordshire, LU6 1JP / GB Opponent's representative Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | 02
04.02.2000
22.02.2000
ADMISSIBLE GE Spelutveckling 41580 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Ekström, Nils Zacco Sweden AB Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | 03
04.02.2000
22.02.2000
ADMISSIBLE GTECH Corporation 55 Technology Way West Greenwich, RI 02817 / US Opponent's representative Altenburg, Udo, et al, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.02.2000
22.02.2000
ADMISSIBLE THE NATIONAL BINGO GAME ASSOCIATION LIMITED Lexham House, 75 High Street North, Dunstable Bedfordshire, LU6 1JP / GB Opponent's representative Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
02
04.02.2000
22.02.2000
ADMISSIBLE GE Spelutveckling 41580 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Ekström, Nils Albihns Göteborg AB P.O. Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | |||
03
04.02.2000
22.02.2000
ADMISSIBLE GTECH Corporation 55 Technology Way West Greenwich, RI 02817 / US Opponent's representative Altenburg, Udo, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | |||
Former [2001/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.02.2000
22.02.2000
ADMISSIBLE THE NATIONAL BINGO GAME ASSOCIATION LIMITED Lexham House, 75 High Street North, Dunstable Bedfordshire, LU6 1JP / GB Opponent's representative Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
02
04.02.2000
22.02.2000
ADMISSIBLE GE Spelutveckling 41580 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Ekström, Nils Albihns Göteborg AB P.O. Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | |||
03
04.02.2000
22.02.2000
ADMISSIBLE GTECH Corporation 55 Technology Way West Greenwich, RI 02817 / US Opponent's representative Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | |||
Former [2000/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.02.2000
22.02.2000
ADMISSIBLE THE NATIONAL BINGO GAME ASSOCIATION LIMITED Lexham House, 75 High Street North, Dunstable Bedfordshire, LU6 1JP / GB Opponent's representative Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
02
04.02.2000
22.02.2000
ADMISSIBLE GE Spelutveckling 41580 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Ekström, Nils Göteborgs Patentbyra Dahls AB, Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | |||
03
04.02.2000
22.02.2000
ADMISSIBLE GTECH Corporation 55 Technology Way West Greenwich, RI 02817 / US Opponent's representative Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | 31.03.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.12.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 30.01.2003 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.09.2001 | DK | 07.09.2001 | GB | 07.09.2001 | IE | 07.09.2001 | LU | 07.09.2001 | MC | 07.09.2001 | ES | 08.09.2001 | SE | 08.09.2001 | BE | 30.09.2001 | CH | 30.09.2001 | GR | 30.09.2001 | LI | 30.09.2001 | PT | 31.03.2002 | NL | 01.04.2002 | DE | 01.05.2002 | FR | 31.05.2002 | [2007/30] |
Former [2004/38] | AT | 07.09.2001 | |
DK | 07.09.2001 | ||
GB | 07.09.2001 | ||
IE | 07.09.2001 | ||
MC | 07.09.2001 | ||
ES | 08.09.2001 | ||
SE | 08.09.2001 | ||
BE | 30.09.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
GR | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
PT | 31.03.2002 | ||
NL | 01.04.2002 | ||
DE | 01.05.2002 | ||
FR | 31.05.2002 | ||
Former [2004/09] | AT | 07.09.2001 | |
DK | 07.09.2001 | ||
GB | 07.09.2001 | ||
IE | 07.09.2001 | ||
MC | 07.09.2001 | ||
SE | 08.09.2001 | ||
BE | 30.09.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
GR | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
PT | 31.03.2002 | ||
NL | 01.04.2002 | ||
DE | 01.05.2002 | ||
FR | 31.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 07.09.2001 | |
DK | 07.09.2001 | ||
GB | 07.09.2001 | ||
IE | 07.09.2001 | ||
MC | 07.09.2001 | ||
SE | 08.09.2001 | ||
BE | 30.09.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
PT | 31.03.2002 | ||
NL | 01.04.2002 | ||
GR | 19.04.2002 | ||
DE | 01.05.2002 | ||
FR | 31.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/32] | AT | 07.09.2001 | |
GB | 07.09.2001 | ||
IE | 07.09.2001 | ||
MC | 07.09.2001 | ||
SE | 08.09.2001 | ||
BE | 30.09.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
PT | 31.03.2002 | ||
NL | 01.04.2002 | ||
GR | 19.04.2002 | ||
DE | 01.05.2002 | ||
FR | 31.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | FR | 01.10.1999 | |
AT | 07.09.2001 | ||
GB | 07.09.2001 | ||
IE | 07.09.2001 | ||
MC | 07.09.2001 | ||
SE | 08.09.2001 | ||
BE | 30.09.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
PT | 31.03.2002 | ||
NL | 01.04.2002 | ||
GR | 19.04.2002 | ||
DE | 01.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | FR | 01.10.1999 | |
AT | 07.09.2001 | ||
GB | 07.09.2001 | ||
IE | 07.09.2001 | ||
MC | 07.09.2001 | ||
SE | 08.09.2001 | ||
BE | 30.09.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
PT | 31.03.2002 | ||
NL | 01.04.2002 | ||
GR | 19.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | FR | 01.10.1999 | |
GB | 07.09.2001 | ||
IE | 07.09.2001 | ||
MC | 07.09.2001 | ||
SE | 08.09.2001 | ||
BE | 30.09.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
PT | 31.03.2002 | ||
NL | 01.04.2002 | ||
GR | 19.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | FR | 01.10.1999 | |
GB | 07.09.2001 | ||
IE | 07.09.2001 | ||
MC | 07.09.2001 | ||
SE | 08.09.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
NL | 01.04.2002 | ||
GR | 19.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FR | 01.10.1999 | |
IE | 07.09.2001 | ||
MC | 07.09.2001 | ||
SE | 08.09.2001 | ||
NL | 01.04.2002 | ||
GR | 19.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FR | 01.10.1999 | |
IE | 07.09.2001 | ||
MC | 07.09.2001 | ||
SE | 08.09.2001 | ||
NL | 01.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/43] | FR | 01.10.1999 | |
MC | 07.09.2001 | ||
SE | 08.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/26] | FR | 01.10.1999 | |
SE | 08.09.2001 | ||
Former [2000/25] | FR | 01.10.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2197971 (ROBINSON ALAN WILLIAM) [A] 1,17,29-34 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 2, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US4969183 (REESE MORRIS [US]); | [A]WO9014139 (BILGREY SAMSON & CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1,17,29-34 * claims 1,3,6 *; | [A]US5119295 (KAPUR SHASHI B [US]) | International search | [XY]US4909516 (KOLINSKY ALFRED P [US]); | [Y]US5007649 (RICHARDSON JOHN [US]) |