EP0720477 - METHOD AND COMPOSITIONS FOR MAINTAINING GLOMERULAR FILTRATION RATE WHILE INHIBITION EXTRACELLULAR MATRIX ACCUMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY Nashville, TN 37232-0146 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | For all designated states VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY Nashville, TN 37232-0146 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KON, Valentina 6536 Radcliff Drive Nashville, TN 37221 / US | 02 /
FOGO, Agnes 492 Page Drive Mount Juliet, TN 37122 / US | 03 /
ICHIKAWA, Iekuni 4378 Chickering Lane Nashville, TN 37215 / US | [1996/28] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | Perry, Robert Edward GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93922168.5 | 09.09.1993 | [1996/28] | WO1993US08527 | Priority number, date | US19920942756 | 09.09.1992 Original published format: US 942756 | [1996/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9405289 | Date: | 17.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0720477 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.03.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/44, A61K31/435 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4178 (EP,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61P13/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND PRÄPARATE ZUR AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DER GLOMERULÄREN FILTRATIONSRATE BEI GLEICHZEITIGER HEMMUNG DER EXTRAZELLULÄREN MATRIXAKKUMULATION | [1996/28] | English: | METHOD AND COMPOSITIONS FOR MAINTAINING GLOMERULAR FILTRATION RATE WHILE INHIBITION EXTRACELLULAR MATRIX ACCUMULATION | [1996/28] | French: | PROCEDE ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT DE MAINTENIR LE TAUX DE FILTRATION GLOMERULAIRE TOUT EN INHIBANT L'ACCUMULATION DE MATRICES EXTRACELLULAIRES | [1996/28] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.1995 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.1995 | Search fee paid | 07.04.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.04.1995 | Examination requested [1996/28] | 01.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/47] | 15.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 18.06.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/47] | Request for further processing for: | 15.07.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.07.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9210182 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB]) [XY] 1-10 * the whole document * * claims 1,9 *; | [Y]US5049565 (CHEN SHIEH-SHUNG T [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5087702 (CHEN SHIEH-SHUNG T [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XY] - S.D. KIVLIGHN ET AL, "L-158,809: Antihypertensive efficacy and effects on renal function in the conscious spontaneously hypertensive rat (SHR)", FASEB J, vol. 5, no. 6, page a1576 [XY] 1-10 * abstract * | [PXY] - V. KON ET AL., "Bradykinin causes selective efferent arteriolar dilation during angiotensin I converting enzyme inhibition", KIDNEY INT, vol. 44, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1038/ki.1993.279, pages 545 - 550, XP000560904 [PXY] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ki.1993.279 | [XY] - S.D. KIVLIGHN ET AL., "Antihypertensive efficacy and effects on renal function of L-158,809: A nonpeptide orally active angiotensin II antagonist", HYPERTENSION, vol. 19, no. 1, page I135 [XY] 1-10 * abstract * | [XY] - Y. KAKINUMA ET AL., "Blood pressure-independent effect of angiotensin inhibition on vascular lesions of chronic renal failure", KIDNEY INT., vol. 42, no. 1, pages 46 - 50 [XY] 1-10 * the whole document * | [XY] - BOVEE KC ET AL, "Effects of the nonpeptide angiotensin II receptor antagonist DuP 753 on blood pressure and renal functions in spontaneously hypertensive PH dogs.", AM J HYPERTENS, APR 1991, 4 (4 PT 2) P327S-333S, UNITED STATES [X] 1-5,7-10 * the whole document * [Y] 1-10 | [XY] - CHAN DP ET AL, "Renal-specific actions of angiotensin II receptor antagonism in the anesthetized dog.", AM J HYPERTENS, JUN 1992, 5 (6 PT 1) P354-60, UNITED STATES [X] 1-5,7-10 * the whole document * [Y] 1-10 | [PX] - E.P. PETEN, "High dose ACE inhibitor (ACEI) or ANGII receptor antagonist (ANGII RI) therapy does not improve glomerulosclerosis (GS) in mice transgenic for growth hormone (GH mice)", J AM SOC NEPHROL, vol. 4, no. 3, page 780, XP000561045 [PX] 9,10 * abstract * | [T] - J. HARLOS ET AL., "Antihypertensiva und Proteinurie", NIEREN-HOCHDRUCKKR., vol. 22, no. 11, pages 573 - 582, XP000560993 [T] 1-10 * the whole document * * page 575 * | International search | [X] - THE FASEB JOURNAL, Vol. 5, issued January 1991, CHANG et al., "In vitro Pharmacology of a Highly Potent and Selective... Antagonist", page A1575, Abstract No. 6993. |