EP0673298 - LOCKING MECHANISM FOR MULTIPLE BELT GRINDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unova IP Corp. 21900 Burbank Boulevard Woodland Hills CA 91367-7418 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states Unova IP Corp. 21900 Burbank Boulevard Woodland Hills, CA 91367-7418 / US | ||
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states Unova IP Corp. 360 North Crescent Drive Beverly Hills, California 90210 / US | ||
Former [1995/39] | For all designated states WESTERN ATLAS INC. 20 East Sixth Street Waynesboro PA 17268 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAISER, Russell, E., Jr. 7641 Robinson Road Mercersburg, PA 17236 / US | 02 /
LUECKEMAN, Steven, G. 5476 West Weir Road Oscoda, MI 48750 / US | [1995/39] | Representative(s) | Nash, Keith Wilfrid, et al Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/39] | Nash, Keith Wilfrid, et al KEITH W. NASH & Co. Pearl Assurance House 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 93922378.0 | 30.09.1993 | [1995/39] | WO1993US09105 | Priority number, date | US19920953798 | 30.09.1992 Original published format: US 953798 | [1995/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9407652 | Date: | 14.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0673298 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0673298 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.04.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B24B21/12, B24B41/04, B23Q16/00 | [1996/01] | CPC: |
B24B19/12 (EP,US);
B24B21/12 (KR);
B24B21/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/39] | B24B21/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/39] | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGSEINRICHTUNG AN EINER MEHRBAND SCHLEIFMASCHINE | [1995/39] | English: | LOCKING MECHANISM FOR MULTIPLE BELT GRINDING MACHINE | [1995/39] | French: | MECANISME DE BLOCAGE DE MACHINE A RECTIFIER A RUBANS ABRASIFS MULTIPLES | [1995/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.1995 | Search fee paid | 14.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 14.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/39] | 26.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.06.1995 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.1995 | 16.06.1995 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.1995 | 16.06.1995 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.1995 | 16.06.1995 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.1995 | 16.06.1995 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.1995 | 16.06.1995 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.1999 | BE | 28.07.1999 | CH | 28.07.1999 | ES | 28.07.1999 | GR | 28.07.1999 | LI | 28.07.1999 | NL | 28.07.1999 | SE | 28.07.1999 | IE | 30.09.1999 | LU | 30.09.1999 | DK | 28.10.1999 | PT | 28.10.1999 | MC | 31.03.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
BE | 28.07.1999 | ||
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
ES | 28.07.1999 | ||
GR | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
NL | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
IE | 30.09.1999 | ||
DK | 28.10.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
MC | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/18] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
BE | 28.07.1999 | ||
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
ES | 28.07.1999 | ||
GR | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
NL | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
IE | 30.09.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
MC | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
BE | 28.07.1999 | ||
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
ES | 28.07.1999 | ||
GR | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
NL | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
IE | 30.09.1999 | ||
MC | 30.09.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
BE | 28.07.1999 | ||
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
ES | 28.07.1999 | ||
GR | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
NL | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
IE | 30.09.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
MC | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
BE | 28.07.1999 | ||
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
ES | 28.07.1999 | ||
GR | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
IE | 30.09.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
MC | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
BE | 28.07.1999 | ||
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
GR | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
IE | 30.09.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
MC | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
BE | 28.07.1999 | ||
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
GR | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
IE | 30.09.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
MC | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/12] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
BE | 28.07.1999 | ||
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
IE | 30.09.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
MC | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
BE | 28.07.1999 | ||
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
MC | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
BE | 28.07.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
CH | 04.11.1999 | ||
LI | 04.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/26] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
BE | 28.07.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
BE | 28.07.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US3354588 (ROEHRIG PHILLIP J); | [A]US4742650 (SAUDER JR H RICHARD [US], et al); | [Y]US5094036 (BOTTEGHI GINO [IT]); | [Y]US5142827 (PHILLIPS JAMES D [US]) |