EP0665778 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO THE MANUFACTURE OR ROTARY VALVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2000 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2000 [2000/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bishop Steering Pty Limited 10 Waterloo Road North Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | [1998/37] |
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states A.E. BISHOP & ASSOCIATES PTY. LTD. 10 Waterloo Road North Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISHOP, Arthur, Ernest 21 Seaman Street Greenwich, NSW 2065 / AU | [1995/32] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93922445.7 | 30.09.1993 | [1995/32] | WO1993AU00504 | Priority number, date | AU1992PL05468 | 23.10.1992 Original published format: AU PL546892 | [1995/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9409943 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0665778 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0665778 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.05.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B24B5/36, B24B19/02 | [1995/32] | CPC: |
B62D5/083 (EP,US);
B24B5/36 (KR);
B24B19/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/32] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN AN ODER IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT DER HERSTELLUNG VON DREHSCHIEBERVENTILEN | [1995/32] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO THE MANUFACTURE OR ROTARY VALVES | [1995/32] | French: | AMELIORATION CONCERNANT LES VALVES ROTATIVES ET LEUR FABRICATION | [1995/32] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.1995 | Search fee paid | 05.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 05.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/32] | 12.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2623812 (POETING WALTER INGBUERO) [A] 1,11,12 * figure -; claim - * | International search | [A]AU8766091 (BISHOP A E & ASS [AU]); | [A]AU8856591 (A E BISHOP & ASSOCIATES PTY LTD); | [A]DE4101671 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]); | [A]JP57205056 ; | [A]JP56082160 ; | [A]JP55101364 ; | [A]JP03251356 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, M-199, page 124; & JP,A,57 205 056 (BROTHER KOGYO KK) 16 December 1982 (16.12.82), Abstract., & JP57205056 A 19821216 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, M-90, page 19; & JP,A,56 082 160 (KASUYA SEIKOU KK) 4 July 1981 (04.07.81), Abstract., & JP56082160 A 19810704 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, M-36, page 162; & JP,A,55 101 364 (TAKASAKI YAKIN KOGYO KK) 2 August 1980 (02.08.80), Abstract., & JP55101364 A 19800802 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, M-1208, page 111; & JP,A,03 251 356 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.) 8 November 1991 (08.11.91), Abstract., & JP03251356 A 19911108 |