EP0693034 - HATCH SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.1999 [1999/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANTI-SPILL TECHNOLOGY PTY. LIMITED 10 Waugh Crescent Blacktown, NSW 2148 / AU | [1996/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOULDING, Grahame, James 41 Greendale Road Bringelly, NSW 2171 / AU | [1996/04] | Representative(s) | Ryan, Anne Mary Anne Ryan & Co 2 Crofton Terrace Dun Laoghaire, County Dublin A96 V6P7 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | Ryan, Anne Mary c/o Anne Ryan & Co. 60 Northumberland Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 93922446.5 | 30.09.1993 | [1996/04] | WO1993AU00506 | Priority number, date | AU1992PL05070 | 01.10.1992 Original published format: AU PL507092 | [1996/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9407772 | Date: | 14.04.1994 | [1994/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0693034 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 14.04.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65D90/10, // B63B19/14 | [1996/04] | CPC: |
B63B19/14 (EP,US);
B65D90/10 (EP,US);
Y10S220/20 (EP,US);
Y10S220/24 (EP,US);
Y10S292/11 (EP,US);
Y10T292/212 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/04] | Title | German: | DICHTUNG FÜR MANNLOCH | [1996/04] | English: | HATCH SEAL | [1996/04] | French: | FERMETURE ETANCHE POUR UNE TRAPPE | [1996/04] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.1995 | Search fee paid | 31.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 31.03.1995 | Examination requested [1996/04] | 13.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/03] | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XY]US3561637 (MCCONNELL WILLIAM); | [XY]FR532218 (HACART PERE ET FILS AINE); | [X]SU1188055 ; | [X]FR569904 ; | [X]AU2355884 (MARTIN ENG CO); | [X]US4732294 (BOHLER JAMES R [US], et al); | [Y]US3239175 (SEIBEL WALTER D); | [X]AU3646878 (BOC SUBOCEAN SERVICES LTD); | [A]AU3344589 (LAPORTE INDUSTRIES LTD); | [A]US5011038 (SCHULTZ FRANCIS R [US]); | [A]EP0385860 (BERG ROBIN L [US], et al); | [A]DE3042547 (KOLOSEUS GMBH [AT]); | [A]FR2640376 (SCHNEIDER EVELYNE [FR]); | [A]SU1684178 | [X] - DERWENT ABSTRACT Accession No. 86-142631/22, Class Q33; & SU,A,1188055 (SOKOLOV) 30 October 1985 (30.10.85), Abstract., & SU1188055 A 00000000 | [A] - DERWENT ABSTRACT Accession No. 92-306159/37, Class Q34; & SU,A,1684178 (AZOVMASH) 15 October 1991 (15.10.91), Abstract., & SU1684178 A 00000000 |