EP0664830 - AQUEOUS DETERGENT MIXTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.1997 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 28.01.1998 [1998/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIESEN, Brigitte Böcklinstrasse 2 D-40235 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
KREIENFELD, Günter Am Nettchesfeld 8 D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
SYLDATH, Andreas Am Nettchesfeld 25 D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
SCHMID, Karl-Heinz Stifter Strasse 10 D-40822 Mettmann / DE | [1995/31] | Application number, filing date | 93922519.9 | 06.10.1993 | [1995/31] | WO1993EP02727 | Priority number, date | DE19924234487 | 14.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4234487 | [1995/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9409102 | Date: | 28.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0664830 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0664830 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/94 | [1995/31] | CPC: |
A61K8/442 (EP,US);
A61K8/463 (EP,US);
A61K8/604 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
C11D1/94 (EP,US);
A61K2800/596 (EP,US);
C11D1/146 (EP,US);
C11D1/29 (EP,US);
C11D1/662 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/31] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE DETERGENSGEMISCHE | [1995/31] | English: | AQUEOUS DETERGENT MIXTURES | [1995/31] | French: | MELANGES AQUEUX DE DETERGENTS | [1995/31] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.1995 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/31] | 02.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 29.01.1997 | [1998/05] | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9111506 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * page 1; example - *; | [A]EP0232153 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,7,9 * page 15; claim 6; table 6 *; | [A]US4668422 (MALIK ARSHAD H [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 5; table A *; | [A]EP0341071 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,9 * claims 1-6 * |