EP0626467 - METHOD OF CONTINUOUSLY CARBURIZING STEEL STRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/48] | METHOD OF CONTINUOUSLY CARBURIZING METAL STRIP | ||
[1997/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.1998 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.05.1998 [1998/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION No. 1-28, 1-chome Kitahonmachi-dori Fukiai-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION No. 1-28, 1-chome Kitahonmachi-dori Fukiai-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAGAWA, Tsuguhiko, Mizushima Iron Works of Kawaski Steel Cor. Mizushima-Kawasaki-Dori 1-chome Kurashiki-shi, Okayama-ken 712en 712 / JP | 02 /
KURAMOTO, Koushi, Mizushima Iron Works of Kawasaki Steel Corp., Mizushima-Kawasaki-Dori 1-chome Kurashiki-shi, Okayama-ken 712 / JP | 03 /
HANAZONO, Nobuaki, Mizushima Iron Work of Kawasaki Steel Corp., Mizushima-Kawasaki-Dori 1-chome Kurashiki-shi, Okayama-ken 712 712 / JP | 04 /
MOROZUMI, Jun, Mizushima Iron Works of Kawasaki Steel Corp., Mizushima-Kawasaki-Dori 1-chome Kurashiki-shi, Okayama-ken 712 / JP | 05 /
SATOH, Susumu, Technical Res. Div. of Kawasaki Steel Corporation, 1-banchi, Kawasaki-cho, Chuo-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba-ken 260 / JP | 06 /
OKADA, Susumu, Technical Research Division of Kawasaki Steel Corporation; 1-banchi, Kawasaki-cho Chuo-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba-ken 260 / JP | [1994/48] | Representative(s) | Sanderson, Nigel Paul, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | Sanderson, Nigel Paul, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28, Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 93922640.3 | 15.10.1993 | [1994/48] | WO1993JP01486 | Priority number, date | JP19920277305 | 15.10.1992 Original published format: JP 27730592 | JP19920287523 | 26.10.1992 Original published format: JP 28752392 | JP19920287524 | 26.10.1992 Original published format: JP 28752492 | JP19920344472 | 24.12.1992 Original published format: JP 34447292 | [1994/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9409175 | Date: | 28.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0626467 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0626467 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.04.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C23C8/22 | [1994/48] | CPC: |
C23C8/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN AUFKOHLUNG EINES STAHLBANDES | [1997/21] | English: | METHOD OF CONTINUOUSLY CARBURIZING STEEL STRIP | [1997/21] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE CEMENTER EN CONTINU UN FEUILLARD D'ACIER | [1997/21] |
Former [1994/48] | VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN AUFKOHLUNG EINES METALLBANDES | ||
Former [1994/48] | METHOD OF CONTINUOUSLY CARBURIZING METAL STRIP | ||
Former [1994/48] | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE CEMENTER EN CONTINU UN FEUILLARD | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.1994 | Translation filed | 07.07.1994 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.1994 | Search fee paid | 07.07.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 31.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4950334 (NOBUO NISHIOKA) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 14 - line 15; claim 1 * * column 5, line 17 - line 56 *; | [A]US3950192 (DAVID I. GOLLAND) [A] 1 * claims 1,4 *; | [A]JPH04107256 ; | [A]DE2152440 (BROWN,BOVERI) [A] 1,5,8 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]DE3139622 (WUNNING JOACHIM) [A] 1 * page 10, line 11 - line 28; claims 1-7 *; | [A]DE2835444 (BROWN,BOVERI) [A] 1 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]DE1934145 (HARTMANN & BRAUN) [A] 1 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]DE1942281 (HARTMANN & BRAUN) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE2152439 (BROWN,BOVERI) [A] 1,5-7 * claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920729), vol. 16, no. 351, Database accession no. (C - 0968), & JP04107256 A 19920408 (NIPPON SEIKO) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH04202650 ; | [A]JPH04202648 ; | [A]JPH04198462 ; | [A]JPH01176065 ; | [A]JPS58144469 |