EP0619039 - DISPLAY MODULE FOR MATRIX-SHAPED LARGE-SURFACE DISPLAY BOARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.1997 [1997/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HESS-INDUSTRIEMONTAGEN GmbH Waseneckstrasse 3 77694 Kehl-Goldscheuer / DE | [1996/06] |
Former [1994/41] | For all designated states HG DISPLAY Hans-Peter Henze, Untere Gewerbestrasse 18 D-77791 Berghaupten / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENZE, Hans-Peter Untere Gewerbestrasse 18 D-77791 Berghaupten / DE | [1994/41] | Representative(s) | Thoma, Friedrich Buchenstrasse 20 77716 Haslach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | Thoma, Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Buchenstrasse 20 D-77716 Haslach / DE | Application number, filing date | 93922891.2 | 21.10.1993 | [1994/41] | WO1993DE01008 | Priority number, date | DE19920014444U | 24.10.1992 Original published format: DE 9214444 U | DE19930015745U | 15.10.1993 Original published format: DE 9315745 U | [1994/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9410671 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0619039 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0619039 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G09F11/14 | [1994/41] | CPC: |
G09F9/302 (EP);
G09F11/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/41] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEMODUL, FÜR MATRIXFÖRMIGE GROSSFLÄCHIGE ANZEIGETAFELN | [1994/41] | English: | DISPLAY MODULE FOR MATRIX-SHAPED LARGE-SURFACE DISPLAY BOARDS | [1994/41] | French: | MODULE D'AFFICHAGE POUR TABLEAUX D'AFFICHAGE DE GRANDE SURFACE SE PRESENTANT SOUS FORME MATRICIELLE | [1994/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/41] | 26.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.12.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4827644 (TRAME CHARLES E [US]) [A] 1,9 * figures 4,9; claims 1,4 *; | [A]FR2357125 (LEGRAND SA [FR]) [A] 1,9,18 * page 4 - page 5, line 8; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]EP0157244 (TANNEBERGER LICHTWERBUNG THEOD [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0509159 (FLORIDA PLASTICS MIDWEST INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 5 - line 35; figures 5-7 *; | [PXA]DE9214444U (HG DISPLAY) [PX] 1,2,4,5,10,12 * figures 1-7; claims 1-12 * [A] 18 |