EP0747601 - PRESSURE OIL SUPPLY SYSTEM HAVING A PRESSURE COMPENSATING VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2001 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOMATSU SEISAKUSHO 3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOMATSU SEISAKUSHO 3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIHAMA, Kazuyoshi, Kawasaki Factory of K. K. Komatsu Seisakusho, 3-20-1, Nakaze, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210 / JP | 02 /
IKEI, Kazunori, Kawasaki Factory of K. K. Komatsu Seisakusho, 3-20-1, Nakaze, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210 10 / JP | 03 /
UEHARA, Kazuo, Kawasaki Factory of K. K. Komatsu Seisakusho, 3-20-1, Nakaze, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210 0 / JP | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 93923052.0 | 22.10.1993 | [1996/50] | WO1993JP01534 | Priority number, date | JP19920285777 | 23.10.1992 Original published format: JP 28577792 | JP19920285803 | 23.10.1992 Original published format: JP 28580392 | JP19920074091U | 23.10.1992 Original published format: JP 7409192 U | JP19920074110U | 23.10.1992 Original published format: JP 7411092 U | JP19920075260U | 29.10.1992 Original published format: JP 7526092 U | JP19920075261U | 29.10.1992 Original published format: JP 7526192 U | JP19920076058U | 04.11.1992 Original published format: JP 7605892 U | JP19920077615U | 11.11.1992 Original published format: JP 7761592 U | [1996/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9410454 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0747601 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0747601 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.05.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F15B11/00, F15B11/05, F15B11/16, E02F9/22, F15B13/00 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
F15B13/0839 (EP,US);
F15B11/00 (KR);
E02F9/2225 (EP,US);
E02F9/2232 (EP,US);
E02F9/2267 (EP,US);
E02F9/2271 (EP,US);
E02F9/2285 (EP,US);
E02F9/2296 (EP,US);
F15B11/05 (KR);
F15B11/16 (EP,US);
F15B13/0417 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20553 (EP,US);
F15B2211/275 (EP,US);
F15B2211/30535 (EP,US);
F15B2211/3054 (EP,US);
F15B2211/351 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6054 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6058 (EP,US);
F15B2211/633 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6355 (EP,US);
F15B2211/71 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT [1996/50] | Title | German: | DRUCKÖLZUFUHRSYSTEM MIT DRUCKKOMPENSIERENDEM VENTIL | [1996/50] | English: | PRESSURE OIL SUPPLY SYSTEM HAVING A PRESSURE COMPENSATING VALVE | [1996/50] | French: | SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION EN HUILE SOUS PRESSION A SOUPAPE DE COMPENSATION DE PRESSION | [1996/50] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.1995 | Translation filed | 20.04.1995 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.1995 | Search fee paid | 20.04.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 20.04.1995 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 04.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 12.04.2000 | IT | 12.04.2000 | GB | 22.10.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/12] | BE | 12.04.2000 | |
GB | 22.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | BE | 12.04.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1798428 (HEILMEIER & WEINLEIN) [A] 1,3,5,7,9-12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS6011706 (LINDE AG) |