EP0664898 - FOOT PEDAL CONTROL WITH USER-SELECTABLE OPERATIONAL RANGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine CA 92612 / US | ||
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, California 92623-9534 / US | ||
Former [1995/31] | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive, P.O. Box 19534 Irvine, California 92713-9534 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANGER, Frank 3590 Thompson Place Hayward, CA 94541 / US | [1995/31] | Representative(s) | Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 93923244.3 | 06.10.1993 | [1995/31] | WO1993US09484 | Priority number, date | US19920961138 | 14.10.1992 Original published format: US 961138 | [1995/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9409417 | Date: | 28.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0664898 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0664898 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/10 | [1995/31] | CPC: |
A61F9/00745 (EP,US);
G05B19/106 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00973 (EP,US);
G05B2219/23053 (EP,US);
G05B2219/23056 (EP,US);
G05B2219/23058 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/31] | Title | German: | STEUERPEDAL MIT GEBRAUCHERSELEKTIERBAREN ARBEITSGEBIETEN | [1995/31] | English: | FOOT PEDAL CONTROL WITH USER-SELECTABLE OPERATIONAL RANGES | [1995/31] | French: | COMMANDE A PEDALE DONT LES PLAGES DE FONCTIONNEMENT SONT CHOISIES PAR L'UTILISATEUR | [1995/31] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.1995 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/31] | 06.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 31.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.02.1999 | BE | 24.02.1999 | ES | 24.02.1999 | GR | 24.02.1999 | SE | 24.02.1999 | DK | 24.05.1999 | PT | 24.05.1999 | IE | 06.10.1999 | LU | 06.10.1999 | [2007/29] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 24.02.1999 | |
BE | 24.02.1999 | ||
ES | 24.02.1999 | ||
GR | 24.02.1999 | ||
SE | 24.02.1999 | ||
DK | 24.05.1999 | ||
PT | 24.05.1999 | ||
IE | 06.10.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 24.02.1999 | |
BE | 24.02.1999 | ||
ES | 24.02.1999 | ||
GR | 24.02.1999 | ||
SE | 24.02.1999 | ||
PT | 24.05.1999 | ||
IE | 06.10.1999 | ||
MC | 31.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 24.02.1999 | |
BE | 24.02.1999 | ||
ES | 24.02.1999 | ||
GR | 24.02.1999 | ||
SE | 24.02.1999 | ||
PT | 24.05.1999 | ||
IE | 06.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 24.02.1999 | |
BE | 24.02.1999 | ||
GR | 24.02.1999 | ||
SE | 24.02.1999 | ||
PT | 24.05.1999 | ||
IE | 06.10.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 24.02.1999 | |
BE | 24.02.1999 | ||
GR | 24.02.1999 | ||
PT | 24.05.1999 | ||
IE | 06.10.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | AT | 24.02.1999 | |
BE | 24.02.1999 | ||
PT | 24.05.1999 | ||
IE | 06.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | AT | 24.02.1999 | |
BE | 24.02.1999 | ||
PT | 24.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/21] | AT | 24.02.1999 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0085518 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]) [X] 1* abstract *; | [X]US5091656 (GAHN GERALD S [US]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 3, line 18 - line 45 * * column 6, line 9 - line 10 * * column 8, line 31 - column 9, line 25 * * column 14, line 60 - column 15, line 11 * * column 16, line 61 - column 18, line 7 * |