EP0673370 - TROPONE-SUBSTITUTED PHENYLOXAZOLIDINONE ANTIBACTERIAL AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/46] | For all designated states PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US | ||
Former [1995/39] | For all designated states THE UPJOHN COMPANY 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARBACHYN, Michael, Robert 1216 Miles Avenue Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | [1995/39] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/46] | Perry, Robert Edward, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1995/39] | Perry, Robert Edward GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93923304.5 | 14.10.1993 | [1995/39] | WO1993US09589 | Priority number, date | US19920988589 | 08.12.1992 Original published format: US 988589 | US19930003778 | 13.01.1993 Original published format: US 3778 | US19930066356 | 21.05.1993 Original published format: US 66356 | [1995/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9413649 | Date: | 23.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0673370 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0673370 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D263/20, A61K31/42 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
C07D263/20 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/39] | Title | German: | DURCH EINE TROPON GRUPPE SUBSTITUIERTE PHENYLOXAZOLIDINONE-DERIVATE ALS ANTIBAKTERIELLES MITTEL | [1995/39] | English: | TROPONE-SUBSTITUTED PHENYLOXAZOLIDINONE ANTIBACTERIAL AGENTS | [1995/39] | French: | AGENTS ANTIBACTERIENS A BASE DE PHENYLOXAZOLIDINONE SUBSTITUEE PAR TROPONE | [1995/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/39] | 19.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3149608 (MADAUS & CO DR [DE]) [A] 1,2* claim - *; | [DX]EP0127902 (DU PONT [US]) [DX] 1,2 * claim - *; | [DX]EP0316594 (DU PONT [US]) [DX] 1,2 * claim - * | [A] - TETSUO NOZOE ET AL, "Synthesis and reactions of 2-arylhydrazinotropones II Synthesis of 5-aryl tropolones and B-ring-open colchicine analogues via benzidine type rearrangement of 2-(2-arylhydrazino)tropones", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, TOKYO JP, (198901), vol. 62, no. 1, pages 128 - 142 [A] 1,2 * page 128 - page 134 * | Examination | - BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN vol. 62, no. 1 , January 1989 TOKYO JP pages 128 - 142 TETSUO NOZOE ET AL 'Synthesis and reactions of 2- | - arylhydrazinotropones II Synthesis of 5-aryl tropolones and B-ring-open colchicine analogues via benzidine type rearrangement of 2-(2- arylhydrazino)tropones' |