EP0635216 - FAT COMPOSITION AND FROTHING OIL-IN-WATER EMULSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1998 [1998/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI OIL COMPANY, LIMITED 1-5, Nishishinsaibashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 542 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states FUJI OIL COMPANY, LIMITED 1-5, Nishishinsaibashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 542 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIDAKA, Hiroshi 1-1-4, Kashiwagi-cho, Sakai-shi Osaka 590 / JP | 02 /
INAYOSHI, Kuniaki 360-34, Tarui, Sennan-shi Osaka 590-05 / JP | 03 /
NISHIMOTO, Tugio 851-2, Inokuchi, Kishikawa-cho Naka-gun, Wakayama 640-04 / JP | 04 /
YABUUCHI, Sayoko 4-150-1, Kitashinmachi, Matubara-shi Osaka 580 / JP | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93924194.9 | 09.11.1993 | [1995/04] | WO1993JP01620 | Priority number, date | JP19920324883 | 09.11.1992 Original published format: JP 32488392 | [1995/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9410850 | Date: | 26.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0635216 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0635216 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.05.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A23D7/00, A23D7/02, A23D9/00, A23D9/02 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
C11C3/10 (EP,US);
A23D7/003 (EP,US);
A23D9/00 (EP,US);
A23L9/22 (EP,US);
A23P30/40 (EP,US);
C11C3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1995/04] | Title | German: | FETT ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND SCHÄUMENDE ÖL-IN WASSER-EMULSION | [1995/19] | English: | FAT COMPOSITION AND FROTHING OIL-IN-WATER EMULSION | [1995/04] | French: | COMPOSITION DE MATIERE GRASSE ET EMULSION D'HUILE DANS L'EAU A EFFET MOUSSANT | [1995/04] |
Former [1995/04] | FETT ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND SCHÄUMENDE OEL-IN WASSER-EMULSION | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.1994 | Translation filed | 01.07.1994 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.1994 | Search fee paid | 01.07.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 06.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPS6195098 (UNILEVER NV); | [Y]JPH0475593 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND); | [Y]JPS63291550 (FUJI OIL CO LTD); | [Y]JPS5712950 (UNILEVER NV); | [Y]JPS6314675 (UEDA SEIYU KK) |