EP0669128 - SUSTAINED-RELEASE MICROSPHERE CONTAINING ANTIPSYCHOTIC AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2003 | Revocation of patent | published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Pharma Corporation 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Pharma Corporation 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | ||
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states Welfide Corporation 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1995/35] | For all designated states YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINO, Shigemi, Yoshitomi Pharmaceutical Ind. Ltd. Pharmac. Lab., 955, Oaza-koiwai, Yoshitomimachi Chikujo-gun, Fukuoka 871 / JP | 02 /
OSAJIMA, Tomonori, Yoshitomi Pharmac. Ind. Ltd. Pharmac. Lab., 955, Oaza-koiwai, Yoshitomimachi Chikujo-gun, Fukuoka 871 / JP | 03 /
MIZUTA, Hiroaki, Yoshitomi Pharmaceutical Ind. Ltd Pharmac. Lab., 955, Oaza-koiwai, Yoshitomimachi Chikujo-gun, Fukuoka 871 / JP | [1995/35] | Representative(s) | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93924827.4 | 15.11.1993 | [1995/35] | WO1993JP01673 | Priority number, date | JP19920332441 | 17.11.1992 Original published format: JP 33244192 | [1995/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9410982 | Date: | 26.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0669128 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0669128 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.05.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K31/445 | [1995/35] | CPC: |
A61K9/1647 (EP,US);
A61K9/16 (KR);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K31/4515 (EP,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/35] | Title | German: | EIN ANTIPSYCHOTIKUM ENTHALTENDE MIKROKUGEL ZUR VERZÖGERTEN FREISETZUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR IHRE HERSTELLUNG | [1995/35] | English: | SUSTAINED-RELEASE MICROSPHERE CONTAINING ANTIPSYCHOTIC AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [1995/35] | French: | MICROSPHERE A LIBERATION PROLONGEE CONTENANT UN ANTIPSHYCHOTIQUE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [1995/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.1995 | Translation filed | 24.04.1995 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.1995 | Search fee paid | 24.04.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/35] | 28.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.10.2000
25.10.2000
ADMISSIBLE ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis IN 46285 / US Opponent's representative Fisher, Adrian John Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | 02
05.10.2000
16.10.2000
ADMISSIBLE JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE Opponent's representative Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | 03
05.10.2000
25.10.2000
ADMISSIBLE Alkermes, Inc. 64 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts / US Opponent's representative Chapman, Paul William Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.10.2000
Eli Lilly and Company Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis Indiana, 46285 / US Opponent's representative Fisher, Adrian John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
02
05.10.2000
ADMISSIBLE JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE Opponent's representative Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | |||
03
05.10.2000
ADMISSIBLE Alkermes, Inc. 64 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts / US Opponent's representative Chapman, Paul William Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | 25.01.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.07.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.02.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.02.2003 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/30] | 24.02.2003 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 15.11.2000 | MC | 30.11.2000 | [2002/42] |
Former [2002/17] | IE | 15.11.2000 | |
Former [2002/02] | IE | 08.08.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19921214), vol. 117, no. 24, Database accession no. 239653, XP002009017 [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * | [ ] - Z. RAMTOOLA ET AL., "RELEASE KINETICS OF FLUPHENAZINE FROM BIODEGRADABLE MICROSPHERES", J. MICROENCAPSULATION, (1992), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 415 - 423, XP000296311 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19850506), vol. 102, no. 18, Database accession no. 154676, XP002009018 [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * | [ ] - K. SUZUKI ET AL., "MICROENCAPSULATION AND DISSOLUTION PROPERTIES OF A NEUROLEPTIC IN A BIODEGRADABLE POLYMER,POLY (D,L-LACTIDE)", J. PHARM. SCI., (1985), vol. 74, no. 1, pages 21 - 24 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870209), vol. 106, no. 6, Database accession no. 38375, XP002009019 [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * | [ ] - R. K. CHANG ET AL., "DISSOLUTION CHARACTERISTICS OF POLYCAPROLACTONE-POLYLACTIDE MICROSPHERES OF CHLORPROMAZINE", DRUG DEV. IND. PHARM., (1986), vol. 12, no. 14, pages 2355 - 2380 | International search | [A]JPS568318 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV); | [A]JPS59130211 (KUROODO RARUURE); | [Y]JPS63122620 (SANRAKU INC, et al) | Examination | EP0269921 |