EP0666819 - PLASTIC CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PERSTORP AB 284 80 Perstorp / SE | [1998/05] |
Former [1995/33] | For all designated states PERSTORP AB S-28480 Perstorp / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SYLEGÄRD, Ingvar Tränggatan 10B S-281 50 Hässleholm / SE | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93924852.2 | 22.10.1993 | [1995/33] | WO1993SE00862 | Priority number, date | SE19920003254 | 04.11.1992 Original published format: SE 9203254 | [1995/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9410053 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0666819 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0666819 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65D21/02 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
B65D43/0222 (EP,US);
B65D21/0217 (EP,US);
B65D21/0219 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00194 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00296 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00398 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/33] | Title | German: | KUNSTSTOFFBEHÄLTER | [1995/33] | English: | PLASTIC CONTAINER | [1995/33] | French: | RECIPIENT EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE | [1995/33] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 04.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/33] | 03.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | Opposition(s) | 29.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.01.1998 | BE | 28.01.1998 | CH | 28.01.1998 | GR | 28.01.1998 | LI | 28.01.1998 | NL | 28.01.1998 | DK | 28.04.1998 | PT | 28.04.1998 | SE | 28.04.1998 | IE | 22.10.1998 | LU | 22.10.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 28.01.1998 | |
BE | 28.01.1998 | ||
CH | 28.01.1998 | ||
GR | 28.01.1998 | ||
LI | 28.01.1998 | ||
NL | 28.01.1998 | ||
DK | 28.04.1998 | ||
PT | 28.04.1998 | ||
SE | 28.04.1998 | ||
IE | 22.10.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 28.01.1998 | |
BE | 28.01.1998 | ||
CH | 28.01.1998 | ||
GR | 28.01.1998 | ||
LI | 28.01.1998 | ||
NL | 28.01.1998 | ||
PT | 28.04.1998 | ||
SE | 28.04.1998 | ||
IE | 22.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 28.01.1998 | |
BE | 28.01.1998 | ||
CH | 28.01.1998 | ||
GR | 28.01.1998 | ||
LI | 28.01.1998 | ||
PT | 28.04.1998 | ||
SE | 28.04.1998 | ||
IE | 22.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 28.01.1998 | |
BE | 28.01.1998 | ||
CH | 28.01.1998 | ||
GR | 28.01.1998 | ||
LI | 28.01.1998 | ||
PT | 28.04.1998 | ||
SE | 28.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/50] | AT | 28.01.1998 | |
BE | 28.01.1998 | ||
CH | 28.01.1998 | ||
LI | 28.01.1998 | ||
PT | 28.04.1998 | ||
SE | 28.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/49] | AT | 28.01.1998 | |
BE | 28.01.1998 | ||
PT | 28.04.1998 | ||
SE | 28.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/47] | AT | 28.01.1998 | |
PT | 28.04.1998 | ||
SE | 28.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/43] | AT | 28.01.1998 | |
SE | 28.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/40] | AT | 28.01.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3412893 (JOSEPH SLAPNIK); | [A]FI48257B (KARHUMUOVI OY); | [A]US4499997 (SWINGLEY JR HAROLD E [US]); | [A]GB2203410 (MAIBACH GERD DIETER); | [A]EP0330473 (RENT A BOXX MOVING SYSTEMS INC [CA]) |