EP0688234 - APPARATUS FOR DELIVERING HIGH-INTENSITY LIGHT TO A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2000 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIGHT SCIENCES, INC. 68 Harvard Street Boston, MA 02146 / US | For all designated states BRIGHAM & WOMEN'S HOSPITAL 75 Francis Street Boston, MA 02115 / US | [1995/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KYRICOS, Christopher J. 8 Short Street Cohasset, MA 02025 / US | 02 /
CZEISLER, Charles A. 380 Harvard Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 03 /
KRONAUER, Richard E. 14 Chauncy Street, Unit 7 Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1998/03] | Fuchs Mehler Weiss Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1995/52] | Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing. Weiss Patentanwälte Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 7 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 93925085.8 | 28.10.1993 | [1995/52] | WO1993US10315 | Priority number, date | US19920967613 | 28.10.1992 Original published format: US 967613 | [1995/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9409851 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0688234 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.05.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
A61M21/00 (EP,US);
A61N5/0618 (EP,US);
A61M2021/0044 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0648 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, IT, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/52] | Title | German: | LICHTZUFUHRVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN PATIENTEN | [1995/52] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DELIVERING HIGH-INTENSITY LIGHT TO A PATIENT | [1995/52] | French: | APPAREIL TRANSMETTANT UNE LUMIERE D'INTENSITE ELEVEE A UN PATIENT | [1995/52] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.1995 | Search fee paid | 16.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/52] | 30.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/10] | 12.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1999 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9114475 (US COMMERCE [US]) [A] 1,4,6,8,16* page 4, line 14 - page 7, line 11 * | International search | [XY]WO8908476 (ROSENTHAL NORMAN E [US], et al); | [Y]WO8908475 (BRAINARD GEORGE C [US]) |