EP0668856 - INHIBITORS OF FARNESYL-PROTEIN TRANSFERASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.1999 [1999/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESOLMS, S., Jane 735 Port Indian Road Norristown, PA 19403 / US | 02 /
GRAHAM, Samuel, L. 325 Widlund Drive Schwenksville, PA 19473 / US | [1995/35] | Representative(s) | Hiscock, Ian James, et al European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | Hiscock, Ian James, et al European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 93925094.0 | 27.10.1993 | [1995/35] | WO1993US10330 | Priority number, date | US19920968106 | 29.10.1992 Original published format: US 968106 | [1995/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9410137 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0668856 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.05.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/06, A61K37/02 | [1995/44] | CPC: |
C07K5/06078 (EP,US);
C07C321/04 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D305/12 (EP,US);
C07D309/30 (EP,US);
C07K5/06034 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1995/35] | C07C321/04, A61K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/35] | Title | German: | INHIBITOREN DER FARNESYL-PROTEINTRANSFERASE | [1995/35] | English: | INHIBITORS OF FARNESYL-PROTEIN TRANSFERASE | [1995/35] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE LA FARNESYLE-PROTEINE TRANSFERASE | [1995/35] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.1995 | Search fee paid | 29.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/35] | 01.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/43] | 02.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1998 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0461869 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [Y] 1-14* example -; claim - *; | [PX]EP0535731 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [PX] 1-14 * example -; claim - *; | [PX]EP0535730 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [PX] 1-14 * example -; claim - * | [PX] - KOHL, NANCY E. ET AL, "Selective inhibition of ras-dependent transformation by a farnesyltransferase inhibitor", SCIENCE (WASHINGTON, D. C., 1883-) (1993), 260(5116), 1934-7 CODEN: SCIEAS;ISSN: 0036-8075, (19930625) [PX] 1-14 * figure 1 * | [PX] - GARCIA, ANA MARIA ET AL, "Peptidomimetic inhibitors of ras farnesylation and function in whole cells", J. BIOL. CHEM. (1993), 268(25), 18415-18 CODEN: JBCHA3;ISSN: 0021-9258, (19930905) [PX] 1-14 * page 18416, column L, paragraph 6 - page 18418, column R, paragraph 2; figure 1 * | [Y] - A.F. Spatola: 'Peptide Backbone Modifi- cations: A Structure-Aktivity Analysis of Peptides Containing Amide Bond Surrogates, Conformational Constraints, and Related .' [Y] 1-14 * in: Chemistry and Biochemistry of Amino Acids, Peptides and Proteins, ed. by B. Weinstein, pub * * by Marcel Dekker, New York, US, 1983, * * pages 267-357; page 278, paragraph 281 * * page 300, paragraph 304 * | International search | [AP]US5216013 (HANSON GUNNAR J [US]); | [AP]US5217991 (HANSON GUNNAR J [US], et al) |