EP0608706 - Method to recover sericin dissolved in degumming baths, plant to carry out such method and sericin thus obtained [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.1996 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.1996 [1996/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASCAMI SETA - FILATURE SERICHE RIUNITE SpA Via B. Sella 124 I-13068 Vallemosso (VC) / IT | [1994/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Velo, Luigi Maria Via Martinat 5 I-10069 Villar Perosa (Torino) / IT | [1994/31] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 I-33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 94100351.9 | 12.01.1994 | [1994/31] | Priority number, date | IT1993UD00003 | 20.01.1993 Original published format: IT UD930003 | [1994/31] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0608706 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/44, D01C3/02, C07K15/00 | [1994/31] | CPC: |
B01D61/145 (EP);
C02F1/444 (EP);
D01C3/02 (EP);
C02F1/441 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung von in Entbastungsbäder gelöstem Sericin, Anlage zur Ausführung dieses Verfahrens und derart hergestelltes Sericin | [1994/31] | English: | Method to recover sericin dissolved in degumming baths, plant to carry out such method and sericin thus obtained | [1994/31] | French: | Procédé de récupération de séricine dissoute dans des bains de dégommage, installation pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé et séricine ainsi obtenue | [1994/31] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 04.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/10] | 25.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH04202435 ; | [A]GB301419 (TAKAMINE LAB INC); | [A]EP0361201 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 5,6,10,16 * abstract * * page 3, line 48 - page 4, line 3 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921106), vol. 16, no. 537, Database accession no. (C - 1003), & JP04202435 A 19920723 (SEIREN CO LTD) [X] 1,4,12,14,18,19 * abstract * [A] 2,3,7-9,11,13,15,17 | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 36, Database accession no. 92-295593 [ ] * abstract * | [A] - WERNER STEGER, "Die Naturseide, ihre heutige Veredlung und Ausrüstung", TEXTIL PRAXIS, LEINFELDEN, (196906), pages 379 - 383 [A] 1,2 * page 380, column 1, paragraph L - page 380, column 2 * | [A] - H. FLENSBERG ET. AL., "Naturseide und ihre Veredlung", TEXTIL PRAXIS INTERNATIONAL, LEINFELDEN, (198807), pages 739 - 747 |