EP0607876 - ROOF CONSTRUCTION AND CONTAINER WITH PLANT SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/30] | Plant substrate | ||
[1998/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1999 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bott, Peter Neusatzer Strasse 46 D-75335 Dobel / DE | [1994/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/30] | Representative(s) | Lempert, Jost, et al LICHTI Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Lempert, Jost, et al LICHTI Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [1994/30] | Lempert, Jost, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer.nat., et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60 D-76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 94100467.3 | 14.01.1994 | [1994/30] | Priority number, date | DE19934301312 | 20.01.1993 Original published format: DE 4301312 | [1994/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0607876 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0607876 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/10, C05F11/02 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
E04D11/002 (EP);
B09B3/00 (EP);
C05D9/00 (EP);
Y02A30/254 (EP);
Y02B80/32 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C05D9/00, C05F11/00, C05G1/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/39] | A01G9/10, E04D11/02, B09B3/00, F23J1/02 | ||
Former IPC [1994/30] | A01G9/10, C05F11/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, LU, NL [1994/30] | Title | German: | BEPFLANZBARER DACHAUFBAU UND PFLANZEINHEIT | [1998/39] | English: | ROOF CONSTRUCTION AND CONTAINER WITH PLANT SUBSTRATE | [1998/39] | French: | SUBSTRAT DE PLANTES SUR UN TOIT ET DANS UN RECIPIENT | [1998/39] |
Former [1994/30] | Pflanzsubstrat | ||
Former [1994/30] | Plant substrate | ||
Former [1994/30] | Substrat de plantes | Examination procedure | 06.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/49] | 19.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 23.09.1998 | LU | 14.01.1999 | BE | 31.01.1999 | [2007/29] |
Former [2003/08] | NL | 23.09.1998 | |
BE | 31.01.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | BE | 31.01.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04104736 ; | [X]JPH03146587 ; | [Y]EP0035953 (FITEXA SA [FR]) [Y] 20 * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO8503842 (BEHRENS WOLFGANG [DE]) [Y] 2,4-13 * page 10, paragraph 3 - page 13, paragraph 3; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE3507429 (MST DRAENBEDARF GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 18 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [XY]DE3620814 (SAARBERGWERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,24 * the whole document * [Y] 2,4-15,17,18,20,22; | [Y]DE3816865 (BREHM INTERNATIONAL MARKETING [DE]) [Y] 22 * column 3, line 6 - line 49; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE3828843 (FURUMOTO HERBERT DR ING [DE]) [Y] 11,14,15,17 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 21 *; | [A]EP0475489 (BEHEERMAATSCHAPPIJ OP DE KAAI [NL]) [A] 11* column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 20; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0489982 (KANSAI ENG [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,24 * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 25 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920728), vol. 016, no. 349, Database accession no. (C - 0967), & JP04104736 A 19920407 (ELECTRIC POWER) [X] 1,3-6,8,24 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 31, Database accession no. 91-227100, & JPH03146587 A 00000000 (JUJO PAPER) [X] 1,5,8,24 * abstract * |