EP0612538 - Metallized, implantable cardiac electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.1996 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.1996 [1996/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARDIAC PACEMAKERS, INC. 4100 Hamline Avenue North St. Paul, Minnesota 55112-5798 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | For all designated states CARDIAC PACEMAKERS, INC. 4100 Hamline Avenue North St. Paul, Minnesota 55112-5798 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dahl, Roger W. 15003 Butternut Andover, Minnesota 55304 / US | 02 /
Lipson, David 13109 Poward Way Poway, California 92064 / US | [1994/35] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94100736.1 | 19.01.1994 | [1994/35] | Priority number, date | US19930024176 | 22.02.1993 Original published format: US 24176 | [1994/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0612538 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0612538 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, A61B5/042 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
A61N1/05 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/35] | A61N1/05 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/35] | Title | German: | Metallisierte Herzelektrode | [1994/35] | English: | Metallized, implantable cardiac electrode | [1994/35] | French: | Electrode cardiaque métallisée | [1994/35] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 06.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/26] | 02.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.11.1995 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]FR2180907 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 23 - page 4, line 20; figure 1 * [A] 7,14,15; | [DA]US4559951 (DAHL ROGER W [US], et al) [DA] 1-4,7,9,10,15* column 5, line 19 - column 8, line 15; figures 1-5 * | [YA] - POCHAY,WISE,ALLARD,RUTLEDGE, "a multichannel depth probe fabricated using electron-beam lithography", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIO-MEDICAL ENGINEERING, NEW YORK US, (19790401), vol. BME-26, no. 4, pages 199 - 206 [Y] 1 [A] 7,14,16 |