EP0608817 - Molybdenum-rhenium alloy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rhenium Alloys, Inc. 1329 Taylor Street Elyria, Ohio 44036 / US | [1996/42] |
Former [1994/31] | For all designated states SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG S-811 81 Sandviken 1 / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carlen, Jan Christer 101 Clemson Court Elyria, OH 44035-8286 / US | [1994/31] | Representative(s) | Östlund, Alf Olof Anders, et al Sandvik AB Patent Department 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | Östlund, Alf Olof Anders, et al Sandvik AB Patent Department S-811 81 Sandviken / SE | Application number, filing date | 94101007.6 | 25.01.1994 | [1994/31] | Priority number, date | US19930010389 | 28.01.1993 Original published format: US 10389 | [1994/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0608817 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C22C27/04 | [1994/31] | CPC: |
C22C27/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1994/31] | Title | German: | Molybdän-Rhenium-Legierung | [1994/31] | English: | Molybdenum-rhenium alloy | [1994/31] | French: | Alliage molybdène-rhénium | [1994/31] | Examination procedure | 31.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/13] | 17.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/28] | 11.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB816135 (ASS ELECT IND) [X] 1,8 *Complete Specification, claim 2 and page 1,l.40-47; Example I*; | [A]DE1182842 (BASF AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB873837 (ASS ELECT IND) [A] 1; | [A]FR1548976 (EGYESÜLT IZZOLAMPA ES VILLAMOSSAGI RESZVENYTARSASAG) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [X] - R.ELLIOTT, CONSTITUTION OF BINARY ALLOYS, FIRST SUPPLEMENT, NEW YORK, MC GRAW-HILL BOOK COMPANY, (1970) [X] 1 *Pages 628 and 629* | [X] - T.MASSALSKI, BINARY ALLOY PHASE DIAGRAMS, VOL.2, METALS PARK, OHIO, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR METALS, (1987) [X] 1 *Pages 1622 and 1623* |